Telford v. USA

Defendant: USA
Plaintiff: Hollie Telford
 
Case Number: 7:2013cv05001
Filed: January 22, 2013
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 7 North Platte Office
Referring Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Lyle E. Strom
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 20, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff shall have 30 days to amend her complaint in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Failure to file an amended complaint will result in the dismissal of this matter without further notice. The Court reserves the right to conduct further review of plaintiff's claims pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2) after plaintiff addresses the matters set forth in this Memorandum and Order. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management d eadline in this case using the following text: July 15, 2013: check for amended complaint. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy e-mailed to pro se party)(GJG) Modified on 6/20/2013 to change notice from mailed to e-mailed to pro se party (GJG).
October 4, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - To obtain service of process on defendant, plaintiff must complete and return the summons forms that the clerk of the court will provide. The clerk of the court shall send three summons forms and three USM-285 forms to plain tiff, together with a copy of this Memorandum and Order. Plaintiff shall, as soon as possible, complete the forms and send the completed forms back to the clerk of the court. In the absence of the forms, service of process cannot occur. The clerk o f court is directed to set a case management deadline in this case with the following text: January 30, 2014: Check for completion of service of summons. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party with summonses and 285 forms)(GJG)
October 8, 2014 35 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION - The government's motion for dismissal under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(3) 26 will be granted. A separate order will be entered in accordance with this memorandum opinion. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy e-mailed to pro se party)(GJG) Modified on 10/8/2014 to correct entry to reflect copy e-mailed to pro se party rather than mailed (GJG).
October 8, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND JUDGMENT - Pursuant to the memorandum opinion entered herein this date, filing 35 , IT IS ORDERED that defendant's motion to dismiss (Filing No. 26 ) is granted. This action is dismissed with prejudice. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy e-mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
October 21, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Plaintiff's opposition to the USA's motion to dismiss is deemed untimely. Her motion to file an amended complaint is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy e-mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
October 21, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Plaintiff's motion (Filing No. 38 ) is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy e-mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
November 6, 2014 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Plaintiff's motions (Filing No. 41 , Filing No. 45 , and Filing No. 47 ) are denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy e-mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
March 4, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The complaint shall be filed without payment of fees. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Telford v. USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hollie Telford
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]