Young v. County of Dawes, Nebraska et al

Defendant: County of Box Butte, County of Dawes and Does 1-10
Plaintiff: Jennifer Young
Case Number: 7:2013cv05002
Filed: February 1, 2013
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 7 North Platte Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Referring Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 8, 2014 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: The defendants' Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Disclosure of Additional Expert Witness and Related Materials (Filing No. 42 ) is denied. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TCL )
January 15, 2014 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: The plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Identify Does 1-10 and to File a Second Amended Complaint (Filing No. 41 ) is granted, in part. The plaintiff shall have until January 22, 2014, to file a Second Amended Complaint eliminating the fourth and fifth causes of action. The plaintiff's motion is denied in all other respects. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TCL )
May 23, 2014 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Attorney Amy L. Patras has a pending case in this court and has not paid the 2013/2014 Attorney Assessment. Within 30 days from the date of this order, Attorney Amy L. Patras is directed to pay the $20.00 fee or show cause why he is unable to do so. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (CS)
May 23, 2014 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Attorney Patrick Connealy has a pending case in this court and has not paid the 2013/2014 Attorney Assessment. Within 30 days from the date of this order, Mr. Connealy is directed to pay the $20.00 fee or show cause why he is unable to do so. Show Cause Deadline set for 6/23/2014. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (MTB)
January 20, 2015 88 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - THEREFORE, IT IS ORDERED: The defendants' motion for summary judgment, Filing No. 55 , is granted in part as it relates to the statute of limitation and the remainder is denied as moot. The plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment, Filing No. 50 , is denied, as the Court finds the statute of limitations has run on the negligence issue. The plaintiff's objections, Filing No. 72 , are denied as moot. The defendants' motion in limine, Filing No. 75 , is denied, as set forth herein. This case shall proceed on the constitutional claims. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL)
February 10, 2015 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's oral request to take several depositions is denied. The discovery stay in this matter shall remain in effect. The parties shall have 7 days from the date an order is entered resolving the pending Motion for Summary Judgment 89 in which to schedule a telephone planning conference with the undersigned magistrate judge. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (MBM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. County of Dawes, Nebraska et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Box Butte
Represented By: Vincent Valentino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Dawes
Represented By: Vincent Valentino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Young
Represented By: Patrick M. Connealy
Represented By: Amy L. Patras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]