Bell v. Union Pacific Railroad

Plaintiff: Thomas A. Bell
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad
 
Case Number: 8:2007cv00261
Filed: July 5, 2007
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Lyle E. Strom
Referring Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
 
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51 Railways: Fed. Employer's Liability Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 5, 2007 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (from USDC-Colorado, Case No. 07-cv-00209-PSF-PAC) granting 10 Motion to Extend Time to file response to defendant's Motion to Transfer Case 5 to 3/9/07. Signed by Judge Phillip S. Figa on 3/6/07. (JAE, )
July 5, 2007 15 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ENTRY (from USDC-Colorado, Case No. 07-cv-00209-PSF-PAC) for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge O. Edward Schlatter for Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan. Scheduling Conference held on 3/27/07. (JAE, )
July 5, 2007 16 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER (from USDC-Colorado, Case No. 07-cv-00209-PSF-PAC). Signed by Magistrate Judge O. Edward Schlatter for Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan. (JAE, )
July 5, 2007 17 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED MINUTE ENTRY re: 15 (from USDC-Colorado, Case No. 07-cv-00209-PSF-PAC) for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge O. Edward Schlatter for Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan. Scheduling Conference held on 3/27/07. (JAE, )
July 5, 2007 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (from USDC-Colorado, Case No. 07-cv-00209-PSF-PAC) granting 5 Defendant's MOTION to Transfer Case to USDC-Nebraska. Signed by Judge Phillip S. Figa on 6/27/07. (JAE, )
July 5, 2007 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING CASE (from USDC-Colorado, Case No. 07-cv-00209-PSF-PAC) to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Coan by Judge Figa. (JAE, )
December 11, 2008 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 1/15/2009 at 08:15 AM before Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (CJP)
January 26, 2009 48 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (KBJ)
March 2, 2009 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The plaintiff's motion to amend the complaint 49 is granted. Paintiff shall have until March 10, 2009, to file his amended complaint. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (KBJ)
May 11, 2009 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 58 objection; denying as moot 59 objection on advice of counsel that the matters have been resolved. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (JDR)
June 18, 2009 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The motion to extend deadlines 85 is granted. The deposition deadline is extended to July 15, 2009 and the deposition and discovery deadline is extended through July 25, 2009. All other dates in the progression order remain unchanged. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (KBJ)
July 5, 2007 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE (from USDC-Colorado, Case No. 07-cv-00209-PSF-PAC). Signed by Magistrate Judge O. Edward Schlatter on 2/15/07. (JAE, )
June 22, 2009 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving and adopting 88 the Stipulation for Dismissal. This action is dismissed with prejudice, each party to pay their own costs. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (JAE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Bell v. Union Pacific Railroad
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas A. Bell
Represented By: Douglas Anthony Rossi
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad
Represented By: Mark C. Hansen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]