Bank of the West v. Homestead Homes of America, et al

Plaintiff: Bank of the West
Defendant: Homestead Homes of America, Homestead Capital, Heritage Homes of Nebraska, Heritage Manufacturing, Lincoln Financial, Rodney R. Tompkins and Loreta J. Tompkins
Case Number: 8:2008cv00024
Filed: January 17, 2008
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: F. A. Gossett
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 5, 2009 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 45 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. It is therefore ORDERED Timothy K. Dolan is granted leave to withdraw from this action. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. (PCV, )
March 3, 2009 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 47 Motion to Stay. This order relates back to 10/1/2008. Case stayed through 6/1/2009. Status report due 6/1/2009. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. (CLS, )
July 13, 2009 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL- The Plaintiff's 50 Motion to Dismiss is approved, and the relief requested therein is granted; The complaint and all claims in this action are dismissed with prejudice. The parties shall pay their own costs and attorneys' fees; and the complete record is waived. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (MKR)
July 14, 2009 52 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER OF DISMISSAL - The Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss 50 is approved, and the relief requested therein is granted. The Complaint and all claims in this action are dismissed with prejudice. The parties shall pay their own costs and attorneys' fees. The complete record is waived. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (JSF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of the West v. Homestead Homes of America, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of the West
Represented By: Timothy K. Dolan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homestead Homes of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homestead Capital
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heritage Homes of Nebraska
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heritage Manufacturing
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln Financial
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodney R. Tompkins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loreta J. Tompkins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]