Allstate Insurance Company v. Hewlett-Packard

Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company
Defendant: Hewlett-Packard
 
Case Number: 8:2008cv00039
Filed: January 28, 2008
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
County: Lancaster
Presiding Judge: Lyle E. Strom
Referring Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
 
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
January 9, 2009 21 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER granting 20 Motion to Extend; Depositions due 6/8/09; Pretrial Conference set for 8/3/2009 at 09:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken; Jury Trial set for 8/17/2009 at 09:00 AM before Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom.Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (CJP)
February 23, 2009 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving 22 Motion for Protective Order. IT IS ORDERED that the stipulated protective order is approved and adopted. The parties are bound by the terms and conditions of the stipulation until further notice. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (PCV, )
May 20, 2009 28 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND AMENDED FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER granting 25 Motion to Extend; Depositions due 12/7/09; Pretrial Conference set for 1/25/2010 at 09:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken; Jury Trial set for 2/25/2010 at 09:00 AM before Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (CJP)
December 3, 2009 32 Opinion or Order of the Court FOURTH AMENDED FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER granting 31 Joint Motion to Extend Progression Deadlines. The Final Pretrial Conference is set for August 30, 2010 at 9:00 a.m. before Magistrate Thomas D. Thalken. Trial is set to commence at 9:00 a.m. on September 13, 2010, in Omaha, Nebraska, before the Honorable Lyle E. Strom and a jury. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (JAE)
June 28, 2010 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 39 Motion to Extend; defendant shall file a response to plaintiff's motion to compel on or before 7/2/2010 as ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (SED)
July 16, 2010 49 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Plaintiff's motion to compel 34 is denied. Defendant's motion for a protective order 43 is denied, and defendant's motion to compel the production of Dr. Abraham for deposition 43 is denied as moot. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL )
August 12, 2010 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the motion 51 is granted; John A. Sharp is deemed withdrawn as counsel for defendant. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL )
November 30, 2010 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the stipulation 53 is approved and adopted; this action is dismissed with prejudice and without costs. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Allstate Insurance Company v. Hewlett-Packard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Julie J. Noonan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hewlett-Packard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]