Shata v. U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services

Plaintiff: Bakheit A. Shata
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Case Number: 8:2008cv00074
Filed: February 14, 2008
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
County: Douglas
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Referring Judge: Pro Se Docket
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 2, 2009 13 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the court requests that the U.S. Attorney for the District of Nebraska review this matter and, if appropriate, file an answer or motion no later than 4/1/09. In the event that the U.S. Attorney does not file an answer or mot ion by that date, Plaintiff will be given the opportunity to seek a default judgment. The Clerk of the court is directed to provide a copy of this Memorandum and Order to Defendant and the U.S. Attorney for the District of Nebraska. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter with the following text: April 1, 2009: check for response from US Attorney. Plaintiff's Motion for Status 12 is denied as moot. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copies mailed as directed) (JSF)
June 24, 2009 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Plaintiff has thirty days from the date of this order to effectuate service of process on the United States Attorney's office. Failure to do so may result in dismissal of this case. Defendant's 23 Motion to Extend is granted and defendant has ten days from the date service of process is effectuated on the United States Attorney's office to respond to plaintiffs MOTION to Strike MOTION to Dismiss 16 21 . Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (ADB, )
August 4, 2009 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Clerk's Office shall withdraw 16 from the record. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (JSF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shata v. U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bakheit A. Shata
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]