United States of America v. Cherek

Defendant: Michala A. Cherek
Plaintiff: United States of America
 
Case Number: 8:2008cv00222
Filed: May 28, 2008
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: Real Property: Foreclosure Office
County: Cass
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Referring Judge: David L. Piester
 
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Plaintiff
Jury Demanded By: 28:1345 Foreclosure

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 14, 2008 11 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT AND DECREE OF FORECLOSURE AND ORDER OF SALE in the amount of $100,808.84 plus accrued interest of 1.24 percent computed daily and compounded annually until paid in full; setting priority of liens and directing sale of premises; granting Plaintiff USA's motion for default judgment 9 and against Defendant Michala A. Cherek. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. Copies sent to defendant via U.S. Mail. (LKL)
March 10, 2009 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER-Upon consideration of the Motion to Set Aside Order filed by the United States of America (filing 19 ), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion to set aside is granted, and the Order that was entered on March 3, 2009 (filing 17 ), is set aside. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy to financial)(LKH)
March 11, 2009 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER regarding MOTION to Confirm Sale 21 . Any person wishing to object to confirmation of the Marshal's sale conducted herein shall, not later than March 31, 2009, file with the Clerk and serve upon the parties to this action a written objection to confirmation of sale setting forth the basis for said objection. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copies mailed as directed)(LKH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: United States of America v. Cherek
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michala A. Cherek
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Office of General Counsel USDA - Rural Development
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]