Fiala v. BNSF Railway Company

Plaintiff: Charles Fiala
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Case Number: 8:2008cv00351
Filed: August 5, 2008
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: P.I. : Asbestos Office
County: Seward
Presiding Judge: Lyle E. Strom
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 45:51 Railways: Fed. Employer's Liability Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 7, 2008 20 Opinion or Order of the Court COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from Multidistrict Litigation Panel, Docket No. 875; case will be transferred to USDC-PA, Eastern District (Attachments: # 1 transmittal letter) (Clerk to wait to transfer file until receipt of certified copy of order from district court handling MDL docket) (KBJ)
October 17, 2008 21 Opinion or Order of the Court CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from Multidistrict Litigation, Docket No. 875; case is transferred to USDC-PA Eastern District (Attachments: # 1 Cover letter from USDC-PA) (KBJ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/17/2008: # 2 Main Document, # 3 Cover Letter from USDC-PA) (KBJ, ). Modified on 10/17/2008 to attach the correct documents to this entry (KBJ, ).
June 2, 2009 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Transfer Order from MDL 875 that all cases from the District of Nebraska shall be transferred to the Eastern District of Pennsylvania in accordance with the Court's Administrative Order. (Attachments: # 1 Administrative Order, # 2 Letter)Ordered by Eduardo C. Robreno. (TCL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fiala v. BNSF Railway Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Fiala
Represented By: E. Terry Sibbernsen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]