MJLC, LLC v. Magdovitz Agency, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: MJLC, LLC
Defendant: Magdovitz Agency, Inc. and Robert H Carter
 
Case Number: 8:2008cv00378
Filed: August 19, 2008
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: Real Property: Other Office
County: Box Butte
Referring Judge: F. A. Gossett
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
 
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1446 Petition for Removal

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
September 26, 2008 18 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER. Defense counsel shall report to the court, by letter, no later than 11/20/2008, on the status of the parties' settlement negotiations. If necessary, an initial progression order will be entered at that time. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. (CLS, )
January 23, 2009 24 Featured Case ORDER - Upon notice of settlement given to the magistrate judge, on or before March 23, 2009, the parties shall electronically file a joint stipulation for dismissal. The Rule 16 planning conference set for, is cancelled upon the representation that this case is settled. ( Dismissal Papers Deadline due by 3/23/2009.) Ordered by Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. (JAE, )
May 18, 2009 31 Featured Case ORDER - The Stipulation for Dismissal 30 is adopted. The relief requested therein is granted. The Amended Complaint (Filing No. 1 , Attachment No. 1) and the Third Party Complaint (Filing No. 6 ) are dismissed with prejudice. The parties will pay their own costs and attorney fees. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (JAE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: MJLC, LLC v. Magdovitz Agency, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MJLC, LLC
Represented By: Richard A. Douglas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magdovitz Agency, Inc.
Represented By: Richard A. Douglas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert H Carter
Represented By: Richard A. Douglas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]