United States of America v. 2006 Chevrolet Trailblazer SS, VIN 1GNET13H662222616

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: 2006 Chevrolet Trailblazer SS, VIN 1GNET13H662222616
Case Number: 8:2008cv00403
Filed: September 11, 2008
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: Forfeit/Penalty: Food and Drug Office
County: Buffalo
Presiding Judge: David L. Piester
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Plaintiff
Jury Demanded By: 28:1345 Complaint for Forfeiture

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 3, 2009 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER-The consent motion of the parties, filing no. 19 , is granted and the deadline to file the Report of Parties' Planning Conference is extended to February 27, 2009. Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Piester. (LKH)
February 4, 2009 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER-The records of the court show that on December 12, 2008, (Filing No. 13 ), a letter was sent to attorney Kelsey J. Knowles from the Office of the Clerk directing that counsel register for the U.S. District Court of Nebraska's Case Managem ent/Electronic Case Files System (System.). As of February 4, 2009, the attorney has not complied with the request set forth in the letter from the Office of the Clerk. IT THEREFORE HEREBY IS ORDERED, On or before February 18, 2009, attorney Kelsey J. Knowles shall register for the System or show cause by written affidavit why counsel cannot comply with the rules of the court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Piester. (LKH)
March 3, 2009 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The court has been advised that the parties in the above-captioned matter have reached a settlement of their claims. Within thirty (30) calendar days of the date of this order, the parties shall file a joint stipulation for dismissal (or other dispositive stipulation) with the clerk of the court. This case is removed from the court's trial docket upon representation by the parties that the case has settled. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (JAB)
March 12, 2009 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER regarding 23 Stipulation. The parties' Stipulation is hereby approved. The Nebraska State Patrol shall pay the Claimants, through Mark E. Weinhardt's trust account, $8,000.00. The Defendant property is hereby forfeited to the United States. All right, title or intrest in or to the Defendant property held by any person or entity is hereby forever barred and foreclosed. The Marshal shall dispose of the Defendant property in accordance with law. Upon Mr. Warin's receipt of the $8,000.00, as mentioned above, he shall file a Receipt for the $8,000.00. Upon the filing of said Receipt, this Court shall enter a Judgement in this action. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (1 Certified copy to USM)(LKH)
May 28, 2009 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Attorney Kelsey J. Knowles has failed to register for the court's Case Management/Electronic Case Files System as previously directed. IT THEREFORE HEREBY IS ORDERED, The clerk is directed to remove Kelsey J. Knowles from the docket sheet and discontinue sending notifications to that attorney. Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Piester. (LKH)
June 2, 2009 26 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - On March 12, 2009, and pursuant to the parties' stipulation, this court entered an order (filing 24 ) requiring that the Nebraska State Patrol pay the claimants, through Mark E. Weinhardt's trust account, $8,000 .00. The order further provided that upon attorney Edward G. Warin's receipt of such payment, Mr. Warin was to file a receipt with the court, and the court would then enter judgment. As of the date of this order, the court has not received a pay ment receipt, preventing it from entering judgment. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED: On or before June 16, 2009, the Nebraska State Patrol shall pay the claimants $8,000.00 through Mark E. Weinhardt's trust account, if such payment has not alrea dy been made; Attorney Edward G. Warin shall file with the court a receipt of such payment; In the absence of the above-described payment and filing of the receipt, this case may be dismissed without further notice.Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (LKH)
June 8, 2009 28 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT - Pursuant to the court's order on the parties' stipulation (filing 24 ) and the payment of $8,000.00 to claimants Britt Baker and Mathew Baker by the Nebraska State Patrol, judgment is hereby entered providing that the defen dant property is forfeited to the United States; all right, title, or interest in or to the defendant property held by any person or entity is hereby forever barred and foreclosed; and the Marshal shall dispose of the defendant property in accordance with law. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (1 certified copy to USM) (JAB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. 2006 Chevrolet Trailblazer SS, VIN 1GNET13H662222616
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Nancy A. Svoboda
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2006 Chevrolet Trailblazer SS, VIN 1GNET13H662222616
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]