Zalkin v. Coventry Health Care of Nebraska, Inc.

Defendant: Coventry Health Care of Nebraska, Inc.
Plaintiff: Steven Zalkin
Case Number: 8:2009cv00096
Filed: March 16, 2009
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: Labor: E.R.I.S.A. Office
County: Douglas
0 Judge:
Referring Judge: F. A. Gossett
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1441 Petition for Removal

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 22, 2009 18 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The Plaintiff Steven Zalkin's Motion to Remand and Motion for Attorney Fees & Costs for Improper Removal (Filing No. 12 ) is denied. The Defendant Coventry Health Care of Nebraska, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss the Plain tiff's state law claims (Filing No. 13 ) is granted. The Plaintiff Steven Zalkin's state law claims are dismissed and recharacterized as a claim for equitable relief under 29 U.S.C. §1132(a)(1)(B). The Defendant Coventry Health Care of Nebraska, Inc., will respond to the Complaint on or before June 8, 2009. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (TCL )
March 19, 2010 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 25 plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Conduct Discovery Outside the Administrative Record. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. (CLS, )
April 22, 2010 35 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The Defendant's Statement of Objections to Magistrate Judges Order (Filing No. 32 ) is denied. The Magistrate Judge's Memorandum and Order (Filing No. 28 ) is affirmed. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (GJG)
June 16, 2010 38 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER granting Stipulation 37 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. (CLS, )
September 2, 2010 45 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that a settlement conference shall be held before the undersigned with counsel and representatives of the parties on October 5, 2010 beginning at 9:00 a.m. in chambers, 566 Federal Building and United States Courthouse, 100 Centennial Mall North, Lincoln, Nebraska. The parties' representatives and/or counsel shall be prepared to participate and negotiate a settlement of this case during the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (ADB, )
December 3, 2010 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND FINAL JUGMENT - The parties' Joint Stipulation for Dismissal 49 is approved. All claims asserted by Plaintiff Steven Zalkin against Defendant Coventry Health Care of Nebraska, Inc., are dismissed with prejudice; and The parties will pay their own costs and attorney fees. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (MKR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zalkin v. Coventry Health Care of Nebraska, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coventry Health Care of Nebraska, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas J. Kenny
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Zalkin
Represented By: Jerry W. Katskee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]