Gemini Investors III, L.P. et al v. RSG, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Gemini Investors III, L.P. and Gemini Investors IV, L.P.
Defendant: RSG, Inc., R Group, Inc. and Randall S. Golden
 
Case Number: 8:2009cv00105
Filed: March 23, 2009
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Referring Judge: F. A. Gossett
 
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 11, 2011 102 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: RSG's motion to dismiss (Filing No. 73 ) is granted. Gemini's complaint is dismissed. Gemini's motion to dismiss (Filing No. 92 ) is granted. RSG's counterclaim (Filing No. 72 ) is dismissed. RSG's motion to strike (Filing No. 77 ) is denied as moot. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TEL)
March 20, 2009 26 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 11 Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue; Venue shall be transferred to the United States District Court for the District of Nebraska (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 03/20/2009. (TLU) [Transferred from Minnesota on 3/23/2009.]
April 13, 2009 41 Featured Case ORDER granting 39 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorneys Margaret S. Brownell and Keiko Sugisaka, and the law firm of Maslon Edelman Borman & Brand, LLP, are granted leave to withdraw as counsel for the plaintiffs. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. (CLS, )
April 13, 2009 44 Featured Case ORDER granting 42 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorneys Damien A. Riehl, Matthew L. Woods and the law firm of Robins, Kaplan, Miller & Ciresi L.L.P. are granted leave to withdraw as counsel for the defendants. For this case only, Damien A. Riehl and Matthew L. Woods are excused from registering for admittance to practice in this district and registering for the court's CM/ECF system. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. (CLS, )
April 15, 2009 45 Featured Case ORDER. The consolidated planning conference in Cases Nos. 8:06CV507 and 8:09CV105 is continued to May 19, 2009 at 1:30 PM. Counsel for RSG, Inc. shall initiate the conference call to the court. The Motion to Dismiss filed by Randall S. Golden, R Group, Inc. and RSG, Inc. 11 is pending and is referred to Judge Bataillon for resolution. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. (CLS, )
May 18, 2009 46 Featured Case ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE that Attorney Shaun B. Spencer is to register for the System or show cause by written affidavit why he cannot comply with the rules of the court. The Clerk shall mail a copy of this order to Shaun B. Spencer at his last known address. Show Cause Deadline set for 5/30/2009. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. (Copies mailed as directed) (MKR)
August 11, 2009 49 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that that the defendants' motion to dismiss 11 is denied.Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (CJP)
August 21, 2009 54 Featured Case ORDER granting 51 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. IT IS ORDERED that the motion 51 of Thomas H. Dahlk for leave to withdraw as counsel for Gemini Investors III, L.P. and Gemini Investors IV, L.P. is granted. The court will stop future electronic notices to Mr. Dahlk in this matter. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. (PCV, )
September 11, 2009 67 Featured Case ORDER granting Joint Motion to Extend Deadlines 65 . RSG, Inc., R Group, Inc. and Randall Golden are given until and including 9/30/2009 to answer or otherwise respond to Gemini's First Amended Complaint 53 in Case No. 8:09CV105. Responses to Golden's pending motion to consolidate cases 55 shall be filed on or before 9/25/2009 in Cases Nos. 8:06CV507 and 8:09CV105. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. (CLS, )
September 23, 2009 69 Featured Case ORDER granting and approving 68 Stipulation as to Preclusive Effect of Judgment in RSG, Inc. v. Sidump'r, No. 8:06-cv-507. The pending Motion to Consolidate Cases 55 is deemed withdrawn. The Gemini Parties and the Golden Parties shall file a separate joint motion to stay discovery in Case No. 8:09CV105 pending final judgment in Case No. No. 8:06CV507. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. (CLS, )
September 24, 2009 71 Featured Case ORDER granting 70 Motion to Stay Discovery. Discovery is stayed pending the entry of judgment in related Case No. 8:06-cv-507. All defendants are given an extension of time to respond to the Amended Complaint 53 and shall answer or otherwise respond within ten (10) days after the entry of judgment in Case No. 8:06-cv-507. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. (CLS, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Gemini Investors III, L.P. et al v. RSG, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gemini Investors III, L.P.
Represented By: Keiko L Sugisaka
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gemini Investors IV, L.P.
Represented By: Keiko L Sugisaka
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RSG, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew L. Woods
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Group, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew L. Woods
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall S. Golden
Represented By: Matthew L. Woods
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]