Haferland v. Munoz et al

Plaintiff: Dale Haferland
Defendant: Juan Munoz, Karla Velasquez, Manue Corona and Cargill Meat Solutions Corp.
Case Number: 8:2009cv00247
Filed: July 22, 2009
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
County: Colfax
0 Judge:
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Referring Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 15:1938 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 2, 2009 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE that Attorney Roger K. Doolittle is to register for admittance to practice register for the System or show cause by written affidavit why he cannot comply with the rules of the court. Show Cause Deadline set for 10/16/2009. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (Copies mailed) (MKR)
December 30, 2009 29 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 19 Motion to Consolidate Cases. The above-captioned action is consolidated with Martinez, et al. v. Cargill Meat Solutions, Corp., Case No. 4:09cv3079 (D. Neb. 2009) for discovery, trial and all other purposes. The above-captioned action is hereby designated as the "Member Case". Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (JAB)
January 11, 2010 30 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - On or before January 25, 2010: a. Plaintiffs' counsel shall file the English translation of the executed consent forms written in Spanish and already filed in this case, along with counsel's affidavit or declaration a ttesting to the accuracy of the English translation. b. As a separate restricted access filing, plaintiffs' counsel shall file a declaration or affidavit listing, by court filing number, the name and date of birth for those who have already file d consents in this case, along with the date when the consent was executed. The listing created and maintained by the Clerk in this action, Haferland et. al., v. Cargill, 8:09CV247, shall be separate from the listing created and maintained in the lead case, Martinez et. al, v. Cargill, 4:09CV3079. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (JAB)
June 1, 2011 80 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - On or before June 16, 2011, the parties shall submit to the court a proposed schedule for filing their motion to approve the parties' settlement. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (KBJ)
June 16, 2011 81 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. The parties' motion for court-approved settlement shall be filed on or before 7/8/2011. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (CRZ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haferland v. Munoz et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Haferland
Represented By: Brian P. McCafferty
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan Munoz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karla Velasquez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manue Corona
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cargill Meat Solutions Corp.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]