Loberg et al v. Cigna Group Insurance et al

Plaintiff: Janell M. Loberg and Russ Loberg
Defendant: Cigna Group Insurance and Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 8:2009cv00280
Filed: August 18, 2009
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
County: Cuming
Referring Judge: F. A. Gossett
Presiding Judge: Lyle E. Strom
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 27, 2009 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 11/18/2009 08:00 AM in Chambers before Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (CJP)
November 18, 2009 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The parties shall file a short brief on or before Wednesday, November 25, 2009, addressing the issue of whether the parties are entitled to conduct full discovery or whether discovery in this case is limited to compiling and reviewing the applicable plan documents and the administrative record.Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (MKR)
March 16, 2010 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that defendant shall file under seal, by March 19, 2010, the administrative record in this case; Plaintiff shall have until March 31, 2010, in which to file any additional motions, and defendant shall have rule time to respond. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (CJP)
May 10, 2010 29 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 21 Motion to Amend Complaint. Plaintiffs shall file an amended complaint by 5/17/2010. Plaintiffs' motion for leave to conduct full discovery 22 is granted in part and denied in part. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (JSF)
August 19, 2010 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the parties shall file their cross-motions for summary judgment on or before September 24, 2010. Both parties shall file their briefs in opposition to the respective motions on or before October 25, 2010. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (ADB, )
September 27, 2010 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 40 Motion for Leave to file restricted brief. The brief in support of its motion for summary judgment shall remain restricted to opposing counsel and the Court. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (JSF)
October 26, 2010 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 42 Motion to Restrict pursuant to the E-Government Act. The brief in opposition to plaintiff's motion for summary judgment and in support of defendant's motion for summary judgment 43 shall remain restricted to opposing counsel and the Court. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (JSF)
February 10, 2011 46 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 35 Motion for Summary Judgment: The Lobergs' claim for accidental death benefits in connection with Wade Loberg's death is returned to LINA to evaluate under Wickman v. Northwester n Nat'l Ins. Co., 908 F.2d 1077 (1st Cir. 1990), whether Wade's death was accidental; and The motion is denied in all other respects; granting in part and denying in part 38 Motion for Summary Judgment: Count IV of the Amended Complaint i s dismissed with prejudice; and The motion is denied in all other respects. This action is stayed pending the outcome of review of the claim under the standards set forth above. The parties shall file a written status report on or before September 1, 2011, concerning the progress of the evaluation by LINA. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (ADB, )
December 1, 2011 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Briefs shall be filed on or before January 23, 2012. Reply briefs, if any, shall be filed on or before January 30, 2012, at which time the case will be deemed submitted, unless the parties advise the Court to the contrary. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TEL)
December 2, 2011 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 51 Motion to Seal. Defendants shall file the administrative record on remand under seal on or before December 9, 2011. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TEL)
January 24, 2012 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 56 Motion to Restrict pursuant to the E-Government Act. Thebrief in support of defendants' motion for summary judgment (Filing No. 57 ) is deemed restricted pending further order of the Court. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TEL)
January 31, 2012 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 59 Motion to Restrict pursuant to the E-Government Act. The brief 60 in opposition to plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment is deemed restricted pending further order of the Court. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TEL)
August 14, 2012 63 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION - The Court will enter summary judgment in favor of the Lobergs and will deny summary judgment to LINA. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TEL)
September 17, 2012 71 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION - The Court finds that the motion 65 should be granted in part and denied in part. Computing the interest daily and compounding annually to the date of judgment, in accord with § 1961, the Court finds that plaintiffs are entitled to prejudgment interest in the amount of $121.13. A separate order will be entered in accordance with this memorandum opinion. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (AOA)
September 17, 2012 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND JUDGMENT - Pursuant to the memorandum opinion 71 entered herein this date, Plaintiffs' motion for attorney's fee and costs is granted in part and denied in part. Defendants shall pay plaintiffs' attorney fees and costs in the amount of $38,687.00. Plaintiffs' motion for prejudgment interest is granted in part and denied in part. Defendants shall pay $121.13 in prejudgment interest. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (AOA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Loberg et al v. Cigna Group Insurance et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janell M. Loberg
Represented By: Daniel P. Bracht
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russ Loberg
Represented By: Daniel P. Bracht
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cigna Group Insurance
Represented By: Bryan S. Hatch
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Bryan S. Hatch
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]