v. Jerez

Defendant: Jose Favio Molina Jerez, Eric Holder, Janet Napolitano, John T. Morton, Greg Jensen and Jeff Newton
 
Case Number: 8:2009cv00283
Filed: August 19, 2009
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
County: Douglas
0 Judge:
Referring Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
Presiding Judge: Lyle E. Strom
 
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 8:1105(a) Aliens: Habeas Corpus to Release INS Det
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 9, 2009 22 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION that the Amended Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus be denied. Any objection to these Findings and Recommendation shall be filed within 10 days after being served with a copy of these Findings and Recomnendation. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (JSF)
January 26, 2010 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The Magistrate Judge's Findings and Recommendation 22 is adopted. Petitioner's amended petition for a writ of habeas corpus 16 is denied. This action is dismissed. Respondents' motion to dismiss 20 is denied as moot. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (KBJ)
August 25, 2009 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the petitioner's petition for a writ of habeas corpus, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2241, by a person subject to indefinite immigration 1 is referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (JSF)
August 26, 2009 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that within three business days of service of this order and the petition, the respondents shall show cause why the petitioner's writ should not be granted; the petitioner shall serve his petition and this order on the respondents forthwith; the petitioner shall file a proof of such service with the Clerk of Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (CJP) Modified on 8/27/2009 to correct judge (CJP).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: v. Jerez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Favio Molina Jerez
Represented By: Amy L. Peck
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Holder
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Napolitano
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John T. Morton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Jensen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Newton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]