Riley v. Sun Life and Health Insurance et al

Plaintiff: James Riley
Defendant: Sun Life and Health Insurance and Group Long Term Disability Insurance
 
Case Number: 8:2009cv00303
Filed: August 31, 2009
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
County: Sarpy
0 Judge:
Referring Judge: F. A. Gossett
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
 
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 7, 2012 102 Featured Case ORDER denying 91 the Motion for Protective Order and Renewed Motion to Stay. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (MSS)
February 22, 2010 27 Featured Case ORDER granting 21 Motion for leave to conduct discovery. Plaintiff is hereby given permission to serve on the defendants the Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents attached as Exhibits 1 and 2 to Filing 23 . The defendants shal l serve responses to the plaintiff's Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents within the time allowed by Fed. R. Civ. P. 33 and 34. A party may object to this order by filing an "Objection to Magistrate Judge's Order&q uot; within 14 days after being served with the order. The objecting party must comply with all requirements of NECivR 72.2. The filing of an objection does not stay paragraph 2 of this Order. See NECivR72.2(c). Ordered by Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. (CLS, )
March 10, 2010 31 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The Defendants' objections 29 to Magistrate Judge Gossett's order are denied. Judge Gossett's order 27 is affirmed. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (JAE)
May 28, 2010 43 Featured Case ORDER granting 42 Motion to Extend ; on or before June 2, 2010, the parties will submit their reply briefs in support of their respective motions regarding 35 Motion for Summary Judgment and 32 Motion for Summary Judgment. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (ADB, )
July 22, 2010 54 Featured Case ORDER The Plaintiff James Riley's Motion for Reconsideration (Filing No. 48 ) is denied. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (ETC)
December 1, 2011 67 Featured Case JUDGMENT - The mandate (filing 64 ) of the United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit having issued on November 29, 2011, IT IS ORDERED: 1. Judgment is entered in favor of the Plaintiff, James Riley; and 2. The Defendants, Sun Life and He alth Insurance Co., f/k/a Genworth Life and Health Insurance Co., and Group Long Term Disability Insurance are ordered to pay Plaintiff James Riley attorneys fees in the amount of $16,450.79, and costs in the amount of $502.81. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (GJG)
January 19, 2012 85 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The Motion to Alter or Amend the Court's Judgment (Filing No. 74 ) filed by Plaintiff James Riley, is granted in part, and denied in part, as follows: Defendants Sun Life and Health Insurance Co., f/k/a Genworth Life and Health Insurance Co., and Group Long Term Disability Insurance shall pay Plaintiff $35,668.68 (inclusive of prejudgment interest), together with postjudgment interest on all unpaid amounts, from the date of today's Judgment until sa tisfaction, in accordance with 28 U.S.C. § 1961(a); and Defendants will continue to pay Plaintiff benefits under the Plan, with no offset for the amount of benefits he receives through the Veteran's Administration, so long as Plainti ff meets the Plan's terms and conditions for receipt of benefits. The Motion for Attorney Fees (Filing No. 70 ) filed by Plaintiff James Riley is granted, and Defendants shall pay Plaintiff $35,499.50 in attorneys' fees, togethe r with postjudgment interest on all unpaid amounts, from the date of today's Judgment until satisfaction, in accordance with 28 U.S.C. § 1961(a). Costs have previously been taxed against Defendants in the amount of $1,307.81, per the parties Stipulation (Filing No. 69 ) and the previous Order by the Clerk of the District Court (Filing No. 80 ). Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (TEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Riley v. Sun Life and Health Insurance et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Riley
Represented By: Mark J. Peterson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Life and Health Insurance
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Group Long Term Disability Insurance
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]