National Labor Relations Board v. Crete Cold Storage

Petitioner: National Labor Relations Board
Defendant: Crete Cold Storage
Case Number: 8:2009cv00304
Filed: September 1, 2009
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
County: Saline
Referring Judge: Richard G. Kopf (REFERRAL JUDGE)
Presiding Judge: Warren K. Urbom
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 29:160(1) National Labor Relations Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 24, 2009 14 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. This Court has jurisdiction of the parties and of the subject matter of this proceeding and, under Section 10(j) of the Act, is empowered to grant injunctive relief. To preserve the issues for the orderly de termination as provided in the Act, it is appropriate, just, and proper that, pending the final disposition of the matters herein involved before the Board, Respondent, its officers, representatives, agents, servants, employees, attorneys, successors and assigns and all persons acting in concert or participation with it or them, be enjoined as set forth hereinafter in the order granting temporary injunction. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (GJG)
January 25, 2010 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 19 Motion to Dismiss. On September 24, 2009, the undersigned issued a temporary injunction pursuant to Section 10(j) of the National Labor Relations Act, 29 U.S.C. Section 160(j). Having considered the Petitioners Motion to Close Case, and for good cause shown, the Court finds that said motion should be sustained and that the above-captioned case should be and hereby is closed. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (JAB)
September 9, 2009 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE - Petitioner shall, using the Court's CM/ECF system, file the transcript and exhibits from the administrative hearing held on June 24, 2009, and Administrative Law Judge John West's decision issued on August 17, 2009. Crete Cold Storage, LLC, file an answer, together with its memorandum of law, to the allegations of said Petition with the Clerk of this Court on or before the 11th day of September 2009. A show cause hearing shall be held by tel ephone on the 24th day of September, 2009, at 10:00 a.m., and then and there show cause why, pending the final disposition of the matters now before the Board in NLRB Case 17-CA-24469, Respondent, its officers, agents, servants, employees, attorneys, and all persons acting in concert or participation with them, should not be temporarily enjoined and restrained under Section10(j) of the Act (29 U.S.C. Sec. 160[j]) as prayed for in the petition 3 . A copy of this order be served upon Respondent a nd United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, AFL-CIO, CLC, Local No. 271, the Charging Party before the Board, in any manner provided in the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure for the United States District Courts, or by certified mail, and that proof of service be provided to the Court. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (GJG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Labor Relations Board v. Crete Cold Storage
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: National Labor Relations Board
Represented By: Mary G. Taves
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crete Cold Storage
Represented By: Douglas A. Fulton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]