Houston v. Mylan Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Robert Houston
Defendant: Mylan Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Mylan Technologies, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2009cv00306
Filed: September 1, 2009
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
County: Douglas
Referring Judge: F. A. Gossett
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Wrongful Death
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 9, 2009 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 32 the Defendants' Motion to Strike Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint and Jury Demand; and the Defendants will respond to the Plaintiff's Amended Complaint 30 on or before December 23, 2009. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (JB)
August 4, 2010 60 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER, granting 58 Agreed Motion for Protective Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. (CLS, )
November 15, 2010 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER regarding Joint Notice of Settlement 66 . Dismissal Papers due by 12/30/2010. The final pretrial conference now set for 4/18/2011 and jury trial now set for 5/17/2011 are cancelled, and all other case progression deadlines are terminated, upon the representation that this case is settled. (Deadlines/Hearings terminated.) Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (CLS, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Houston v. Mylan Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Houston
Represented By: Jason G. Ausman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Technologies, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]