Summit Farms, LLC v. Ainsworth Feed Yards, LLC

Plaintiff: Summit Farms, LLC
Defendant: Ainsworth Feed Yards, LLC
Case Number: 8:2009cv00328
Filed: September 17, 2009
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
County: Brown
Referring Judge: F. A. Gossett
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 8, 2009 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER regarding Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting 16 filed by Summit Farms, LLC. Counsel for the defendant shall, no later than 12/10/2009, contact plaintiff's counsel to schedule a planning conference. Failure to do so will result in the issuance of an order for the defendant to show cause why monetary and other sanctions should not be assessed against the defendant pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37. The parties are given until 12/16/2009 to file a joint Rule 26(f) planning report. If no joint report is filed, the court may adopt the provisions of the plaintiff's planning report. Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 12/16/2009.Ordered by Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. (CLS, )
April 21, 2010 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 24 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney. David A. Domina, Brian E. Jorde, and Domina Law Group pc llo are granted leave to withdraw as counsel for Defendant, Ainsworth Feed Yards, LLC. The hearing previously set for 4/29/2010 is cancelled. Planning Conference set for 5/24/2010 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the call to the court at 11:00 AM on 5/24/2010. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. (CLS, )
November 8, 2010 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE regarding 40 Motion for Leave to Suspend Deadlines. Counsel shal file a Response to this order, showing cause why this case should not be referred to the Bankruptcy Court pursuant to NEGenR 1.5(a) and 28 U.S.C. sec. 157. Show Cause Deadline set for 11/16/2010. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (CLS, )
November 18, 2010 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - This case is referred to the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Nebraska. The Motion for Leave to Suspend Deadlines and Trial Date and Set for Status Conference (Filing No. 40 ) filed by Plaintiff Summit Farms, LLC, is denied as moot. This case shall be terminated for statistical purposes by the Clerk of the Court for the District of Nebraska; and The Clerk of the Court for the District of Nebraska shall transmit the court file to the Clerk of the Bankruptcy Court for the District of Nebraska. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (AOA)
April 20, 2011 46 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The Report and Recommendation of U.S. Bankruptcy Court Chief Judge Thomas L. Saladino (Filing No. 45 ) is adopted. The Order of Reference (Filing No. 44 ) to the U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the District of Nebraska is withdrawn. This case shall be progressed by U.S. Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (AOA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Summit Farms, LLC v. Ainsworth Feed Yards, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Summit Farms, LLC
Represented By: Amber A. Furbee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ainsworth Feed Yards, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]