Fuller et al v. United States of America

Plaintiff: Jonathan E. Fuller and Kyoko I. Fuller
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 8:2009cv00377
Filed: October 20, 2009
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
County: Douglas
Referring Judge: F. A. Gossett
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1346 Recovery of IRS Tax
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 18, 2010 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 20 Motion to Extend Deadlines. Mediation status report deadline extended to 6/14/2010. Telephone Conference continued from 6/7/2010 to 8/9/2010 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. (CLS, )
August 9, 2010 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STAY PENDING MEDIATION- This case is stayed until September 30, 2010 to permit the parties to participate in mediation. During the period of stay, compliance with deadlines established by the progression order, responses to discovery and other proceedings shall not be required. Within five days following the completion of the parties settlement meeting, the Plaintiffs counsel shall electronically file a status report advising whether the case has been settled. If there is no settlement, counsel shall notify the undersigned by October 4, 2010, at which time the Court will establish a new progression order. Case stayed.( Status Report due by 2/10/2011.) Ordered by Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. (MKR)
January 21, 2011 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 44 Goverment's Motion to Take the Second Deposition of Plaintiff Jonathan Fuller and request for expedited consideration. Plaintiff Jonathan Fuller shall submit to a second deposition, limited to two hours, on the topics specif ied in the Order. The deposition shall be held in Omaha, Nebraska, at a time and location to be agreed upon by counsel, between February 4 and February 11, 2011. A party may object to this order by filing an "Objection to Magistrate Judge's Order" no later than January 28, 2011. The objecting party must comply with all requirements of NECivR 72.2. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (CLS, )
March 7, 2011 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The parties' Joint Stipulation for Dismissal of Kyoko I. Fuller, With Prejudice 57 is approved; All claims in the Amended Complaint 6 seeking the refund of penalties assessed against Kyoko I. Fuller under 26 U.S.C. § 6677 for th e 2001 and 2002 tax years, and all claims seeking the refund of interest paid on such penalties, shall be dismissed with prejudice; Kyoko I. Fuller is dismissed as a party plaintiff, and the clerk is instructed to remove Kyoko I. Fuller from the case caption; and The parties subject to this order will bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (KBJ)
June 20, 2011 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT - The parties' Joint Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice (Filing No. 67 ) is approved. This action is dismissed with prejudice. The parties will pay their own costs and attorney's fees. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (TCL )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fuller et al v. United States of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan E. Fuller
Represented By: Sheldon M. Kay
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyoko I. Fuller
Represented By: Sheldon M. Kay
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]