United States of America v. $38,480.00 in United States currency

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $38,480.00 in United States currency
Case Number: 8:2009cv00395
Filed: October 30, 2009
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
County: Hall
Referring Judge: F. A. Gossett
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1345 Complaint for Forfeiture
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 30, 2010 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Unopposed MOTION to Extend Deadlines and Pretrial Conference Submission 13 . Non-Jury Trial continued to 10/12/2010 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 2, Federal Building, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Judge Laurie Smith Camp. In lieu of a final pretrial conference, counsel and any pro se parties shall prepare a proposed final pretrial conference order in accordance with NECivR 16.2 and submit it to the undersigned magistrate judge by 7/30/2010.Ordered by Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. (CLS, )
September 24, 2010 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 16 Motion to Extend Deadlines. Jury Trial continued to 11/9/2010 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 2, Federal Building, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Judge Laurie Smith Camp. Counsel shall prepare a proposed final pretrial conferenceorder in accordance with NECivR 16.2 and submit it to the undersigned magistrate judge no later than 10/12/2010. (Case Management Deadline set for 10/12/2010.) Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (CLS, )
October 13, 2010 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 18 Motion to Extend. The joint pretrial conference order shall be submitted no later than 11/12/2010. Jury Trial set for 12/7/2010 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2, Federal Building, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Judge Laurie Smith Camp. Pretrial Conference set for 11/15/2010 at 09:30 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ARL, )
November 5, 2010 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: TRIAL PREPARATION (CIVIL NON-JURY TRIAL). Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (JB)
November 8, 2010 23 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER RE: TRIAL PREPARATION (CIVIL JURY TRIAL). Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (JB)
November 18, 2010 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 25 Motion to Continue Trial. Jury Trial set for 5/17/2011 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 2, Federal Building, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Judge Laurie Smith Camp. Pretrial Conference set for 4/18/2011 at 9:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (CLS, )
June 28, 2011 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: TRIAL PREPARATION (CIVIL JURY TRIAL). Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (JB)
July 5, 2011 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Upon notice of settlement given to the magistrate judge by Nancy Svoboda, counsel for Plaintiff, on or before August 4, 2011, the parties shall electronically file a joint stipulation for dismissal. Absent compliance with this order, this case (including all counterclaims and the like) may be dismissed without further notice. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (JAB)
August 22, 2011 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The parties' joint stipulation 35 is approved as set in this Order. All parties shall be liable to pay their own attorneys fees and costs of this action. Upon Ms. Frost's filing of the receipt referenced above, this action shall be dismissed by stipulation of the parties. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (KBJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $38,480.00 in United States currency
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Nancy A. Svoboda
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $38,480.00 in United States currency
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]