Kelly v. Malloy

Plaintiff: Laurie A Kelly
Defendant: David Malloy
 
Case Number: 8:2009cv00396
Filed: November 2, 2009
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
County: Douglas
0 Judge:
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Referring Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
 
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 26:7402 IRS: Petition to Enforce IRS Summons
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 8, 2009 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL - IT IS ORDERED that this matter be, and hereby is, dismissed without prejudice, each party to bear their own costs; it is FURTHER ORDERED that the hearing scheduled for December 18, 2009 is cancelled. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL )
November 3, 2009 5 Opinion or Order of the Court STRIKE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Show Cause Hearing set for 12/8/2009 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3, Federal Building, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. A copy of this Order, together with the petition and exhibits theret o, be personally served on David Malloy, by an official of the Internal Revenue Service within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Within 5 days of service of copies of this Order, the petition and Exhibits thereto, respondent shall file and serve a written response to the petition.Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL ) Modified on 11/9/2009 to strike per order 6 (TJD, ).
November 9, 2009 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Show Cause Hearing set for 12/18/2009 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3, Federal Building, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. A copy of this Order, together with the petition and exhibits thereto, be personally served on David Malloy, by an official of the Internal Revenue Service within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Within 5 days of service of copies of this Order, the petition and Exhibits thereto, respondent shall file and serve a written response to the petition.Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Kelly v. Malloy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurie A Kelly
Represented By: Laurie A. Kelly
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Malloy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]