Ury v. Union Pacific Railroad Company

Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Plaintiff: Rodney R. Ury
Case Number: 8:2010cv00116
Filed: March 25, 2010
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Referring Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51 Railways: Fed. Employer's Liability Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 14, 2010 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 7 the defendant's Motion to Change Place of Trial to the North Platte Division. The Clerk of Court shall amend the docket sheet to reflect the place of trial is North Platte, Nebraska. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (MKR)
March 14, 2011 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney 33 . IT IS ORDERED: The motion for leave to withdraw of William M. Lamson, Jr. and the law firm of Lamson, Dugan and Murray, LLP (Filing No. 33 ) as counsel for the defendant is granted. The Clerk of Court shall stop all electronic notices to William M. Lamson, Jr. and the law firm of Lamson, Dugan and Murray, LLP regarding this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TEL)
December 5, 2011 51 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 42 Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting 47 Plaintiff's Motion to Supplement Record. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (SMS, )
January 24, 2012 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER upon the parties joint stipulation for dismissal with prejudice 52 this matter is dismissed with prejudice with each party to pay their own attorneys fee and costs. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (MKR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ury v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney R. Ury
Represented By: James L. Cox, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]