simmons v. JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.

Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: whitney a simmons
 
Case Number: 8:2010cv00178
Filed: May 6, 2010
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
 
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 21, 2010 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 21 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery. Defendant is given until the close of business on 11/5/2010 to serve complete responses to all of the interrogatories and requests for production of documents which are the subject of plaintiff's Motion to Compel. Plaintiff's Request for Admission No. 18 is deemed admitted. Plaintiff is awarded reasonable expenses and attorney's fees incurred in making the motion to compel. Plaintiff shall file a separate Motion for Attorney Fees, together with an affidavit attesting to the time and expenses incurred in preparing the instant motion to compel, on or before 11/15/2010. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (CLS, )
November 23, 2010 38 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER (Mediation) The case will not be stayed, but the parties shall have until January 7, 2011 to participate in mediation pursuant to the Mediation Plan for the U.S. District Court, District of Nebraska. Other information regarding media tion, including a list of federal mediators, is available on the court's web site, www.ned.uscourts.gov. By December 20, 2010, the parties shall notify the court of their choice of mediator and the date of their mediation session. Plaintiffs c ounsel shall electronically file a status report within five business days following the completion of the parties' settlement meeting, advising whether the case has been settled. The Clerk shall bring this file to the attention of the undersig ned on January 14, 2011, or when notified that the mediation has been completed, whichever occurs first. A Rule 16 conference will be scheduled, if necessary, after January 14, 2011. ( Case Management Deadline set for 1/14/2011.) Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (MKR)
January 11, 2011 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER regarding Mediation Closure Notice 44 . Joint Status Report due by 2/1/2011. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (CLS, )
January 31, 2011 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER regarding Status Report 46 . Status Report due by 2/22/2011. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (CLS, ) (Main Document 47 replaced on 1/31/2011) (CLS, ).
February 22, 2011 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - On or before April 15, 2011, the parties shall electronically file a joint stipulation for dismissal (or other dispositive stipulation) and shall submit to District Judge Laurie Smith Camp, at smithcamp@ned.uscourts.gov, a draft order which will fully dispose of the case. Absent compliance with this order, this case (including all counterclaims and the like) may be dismissed without further notice. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (AOA)
May 17, 2011 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT - The parties' Joint Stipulation for Dismissal with prejudice (Filing No. 58 ) is approved. This action is dismissed with prejudice. The parties will pay their own costs and attorney's fees. All pending motions are denied as moot. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (AOA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: simmons v. JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Kelly K. Brandon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: whitney a simmons
Represented By: John F. Simmons
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]