Ray v. Lundstrom et al

Defendant: Michael J. Falbo, Charles W. Hoskins, Gilbert G. Lundstrom, TierOne Corporation and Eugene B. Witkowicz
Plaintiff: David G. Ray
 
Case Number: 8:2010cv00199
Filed: May 20, 2010
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
 
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 15:77 Securities Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 8, 2010 12 Featured Case ORDER - Pursuant to NEGenR 1.5(a)(1) and 28 U.S.C. § 157, this case is referred to the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Nebraska. This case shall be terminated for statistical purposes by the Clerk of the Court for the District of Nebraska. The Clerk of the Court for the District of Nebraska shall deliver the court file to the Clerk of the Bankruptcy Court for the District of Nebraska. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TCL )
September 30, 2010 26 Featured Case ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: The Report and Recommendation of Chief Bankruptcy Judge Thomas L. Saladino, Filing No. 20, is adopted in its entirety. The referral of this case to the Bankruptcy Court for the District of Nebraska is withdrawn. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL )
October 1, 2010 27 Featured Case ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: The Motion of the Valentino Group for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Lead Plaintiff's Selection of Counsel in Shareholder Class Action (Filing No. 21 ) is held in abeyance. The non-movants shall have to on or before October 8, 2010, to file any response or objection to the motion of the Valentino Group. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TCL )
October 12, 2010 31 Featured Case ORDER granting 21 Motion of the Valentino Group of Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Lead Plaintiff's Selection of Counsel in Shareholder Class Action. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TRL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Ray v. Lundstrom et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Falbo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles W. Hoskins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilbert G. Lundstrom
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TierOne Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eugene B. Witkowicz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David G. Ray
Represented By: Christopher S. Hinton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]