Simon et al v. Internal Revenue Serv.

Defendant: Internal Revenue Serv.
Plaintiff: David M. Simon and Margaret S. Simon
 
Case Number: 8:2010cv00201
Filed: May 21, 2010
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Lyle E. Strom
 
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 7, 2010 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 9 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Leave to proceed in forma pauperis is provisionally granted to Margaret S. Simon, and the complaint shall be filed without payment of fees. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (JAB)
October 12, 2010 11 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiffs' claim against defendant may proceed and service is now warranted. To obtain service of process on defendant, plaintiffs must complete and return the summons forms which the clerk of the court will provide. The clerk of the court shall send one summons form and one USM-285 form to plaintiffs, together with a copy of this memorandum and order. Plaintiffs shall, as soon as possible, complete the forms and send the completed forms back to the clerk of the cou rt. In the absence of the forms, service of process cannot occur. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case with the following text: "January 28, 2011: Check for completion of service of summons.&q uot; The parties are bound by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and by the Local Rules of this Court. Plaintiffs shall keep the Court informed of their current address at all times while this case is pending. Failure to do so may result in dismissal.Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL )
March 15, 2011 14 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiffs have not properly served defendant in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(i). On the Court's own motion, plaintiffs shall have an additional 30 days in which to properly serve defendant. Failure to do so will result in this matter being dismissed without prejudice and without further notice. (***Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 4/14/2011: Deadline for plaintiffs to properly serve defendant.) Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(JAB)
June 10, 2010 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Leave to proceed in forma pauperis is provisionally granted to David M. Simon, and the complaint shall be filed without payment of fees. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(JAB)
June 16, 2010 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Margaret S. Simon is directed to correct the technical defect in the complaint on or before July 15, 2010. Failure to comply with this order will result in dismissal of this matter as to Margaret S. Simon without further notice. The clerk of the court is directed to send to plaintiff Margaret S. Simon the Form AO240, Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter with the following text: July 15, 2010: deadline for payment or filing of IFP application.Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copies mailed as directed)(AOA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Simon et al v. Internal Revenue Serv.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Serv.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David M. Simon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret S. Simon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]