United States of America v. $13,750.00 in United States Currency

Defendant: $13,750.00 in United States Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
 
Case Number: 8:2010cv00243
Filed: June 28, 2010
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
 
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 28:1345 Complaint for Forfeiture
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
August 16, 2010 15 Featured Case CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (JAE)
June 8, 2011 30 Featured Case ORDER - The plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery (Filing No. 28 ) is granted. Lynn Russell Slade, III, shall present himself for deposition to be rescheduled at the convenience of the parties and their counsel on or before June 30, 2011. Failure of Lynn Russell Slade, III, to appear will result in him being stricken from the witness list for trial and may further result in his claim being stricken in this matter. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (GJG)
July 6, 2011 35 Featured Case ORDER - The plaintiff's Motion to Strike (Filing No. 31 ) is granted. Since the claimant Lynn Russell Slade, III, failed to present himself for a properly noticed deposition and failed to comply with a court order, the Clerk of Court shall stri ke the answer (Filing No. 13 ) and claim (Filing No. 17 ) of Lynn Russell Slade, III, and make a Clerk's entry of default against the claimant Lynn Russell Slade, III. The entry of default may be set aside, upon appropriate written motion, if the claimant Lynn Russell Slade, III, provides the previously requested discovery prior to entry of default judgment. Trial previously scheduled for July 7, 2011, is canceled. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (GJG)
July 13, 2011 38 Featured Case DEFAULT JUDGMENT and DECREE of Forfeiture as to defendant $13,750.00 in United States Currency. The plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment and Decree of Forfeiture (Filing No. 37 ) is hereby sustained. All right, title or interest in or to the Defendant property held by any person or entity is hereby forever barred and foreclosed. The Defendant property be and the same hereby is forfeited to the United States of America. The Defendant property shall be disposed of by the U.S. Marshals Service in accordance with law. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (1 Certified copy to USM)(GJG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: United States of America v. $13,750.00 in United States Currency
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $13,750.00 in United States Currency
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Nancy A. Svoboda
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]