Hayneedle, Inc. v. J.C. Penney Company, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Hayneedle, Inc.
Defendant: J.C. Penney Company, Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc. and J.C. Penney Private Brands, Inc.
 
Case Number: 8:2010cv00436
Filed: November 18, 2010
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Referring Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
 
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 19, 2011 125 Featured Case ORDER granting 107 Motion to Modify Protective Order; denying as moot 110 Motion for Protective Order. On or before October 26, 2011, the defendants shall submit a draft modified protective order, consistent with this order, to the court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TRL)
October 27, 2011 126 Featured Case MODIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TRL)
November 8, 2011 129 Featured Case ORDER OF DISMISSAL-This matter is before the court on the joint stipulation of the parties, Filing No. 128 . The stipulation indicates that the parties have resolved this action. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that this action is dismissed with prejudic e and the preliminary injunction entered on March 16, 2011 and modified on May 20, 2011, is hereby dissolved pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). Each party to pay its own costs. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy provided to USCA-8th Circuit) (MKR)
March 20, 2012 134 Featured Case ORDER TO WITHDRAW EXHIBITS OR TO SHOW CAUSE why exhibits should not be destroyed. Show Cause Deadline set for 4/3/2012. Ordered by District Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (KMG)
February 23, 2011 49 Featured Case PROTECTICE ORDER granting 43 Motion for Protective Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TRL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Hayneedle, Inc. v. J.C. Penney Company, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hayneedle, Inc.
Represented By: John P. Passarelli
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.C. Penney Company, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.C. Penney Private Brands, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]