Genoa National Bank v. Odette et al

Plaintiff: Genoa National Bank
Defendant: Ronald V. Odette and Ronald V. Odette Family Limited Partnership
Case Number: 8:2010cv00438
Filed: November 22, 2010
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Referring Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Account Receivable
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 27, 2011 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Robert A. Martin and Kenneth W. Wasserman of Norton, Wasserman, Jones& Kelly, L.L.C.'s motion to withdraw as counsel for the defendant Ronald V. Odette Family Limited Partnership (Filing No. 38 ) is held in abeyance until June 28, 2011 . The defendant Ronald V. Odette Family Limited Partnership shall have until on or before June 28, 2011, to file a response to the motion to withdraw with the Clerk of Court. If no response is received or if substitute counsel has entered an appeara nce by that date, the motion to withdraw will be granted. Moving counsel shall immediately serve a copy of this order on the defendant Ronald V. Odette Family Limited Partnership and file a certificate of service therefore. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (Copy mailed/e-mailed to pro se party) (AOA)
July 1, 2011 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Robert A. Martin and Kenneth W. Wasserman of Norton, Wasserman, Jones & Kelly, L.L.C.'s motion to withdraw as counsel for the defendant Ronald V. Odette Family Limited Partnership (Filing No. 38 ) is granted. Since the defendant Ronald V. Odette Family Limited Partnership failed to have substitute counsel enter an appearance, the Clerk of Court shall strike the answer of the defendant Ronald V. Odette Family Limited Partnership and enter default against Ronald V. O dette Family Limited Partnership. The entry of default will be set aside, upon written motion, if substitute counsel enters a written appearance on behalf of such defendant prior to entry of default judgment. The plaintiff's Motion to Compel (F iling No. 41 ) is denied. Withdrawing counsel shall immediately serve a copy of this order on the defendant Ronald V. Odette Family Limited Partnership and file a certificate of service therefore. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (TEL)
July 1, 2011 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 48 Motion to Extend. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (Copies mailed to defendants) (TEL)
December 5, 2011 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 58 Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Deposition Deadline. The parties shall have an extension of time until December 30, 2011, to conduct discovery. The plaintiff may depose the defendant Ronald V. Odette by telephone in accordance with the requirements imposed by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The Clerk of Court shall mail a copy of this order to the defendants at their last known addresses found in the record. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (Copies mailed as directed) (JSF)
December 16, 2011 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - before the court sua sponte. The final pretrial conference scheduled for January 13, 2012, and trial scheduled for February 13, 2012 are canceled. The final pretrial conference and trial will be rescheduled after the courts resolution of th e plaintiffs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Filing No. 29 ) and the courts December 1, 2011, show cause order (Filing No. 57 ). The Clerk of Court shall mail a copy of this order to the defendants at their last known addresses found in the record. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (Copies mailed as directed)(MKR)
March 30, 2012 80 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that GNB's Application for Attorney's Fees and Expenses, 76 is granted in part, and GNB is entitled to an award of attorney's fees and expenses against Odette in the total amount of $1,923.61. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (DKM, )
March 30, 2012 81 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Odette's motion for reconsideration 75 is denied. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (DKM, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Genoa National Bank v. Odette et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Genoa National Bank
Represented By: James F. Cann
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald V. Odette
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald V. Odette Family Limited Partnership
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]