Poe v. U.S. Postal Service

Defendant: Unites States Postal Service
Plaintiff: Sherry Poe
 
Case Number: 8:2011cv00222
Filed: June 21, 2011
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Referring Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
 
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1346 Tort Claim
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
December 1, 2011 33 Featured Case PROTECTIVE ORDER adopting 32 Stipulation for Entry of Protective Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TRL)
March 13, 2012 38 Featured Case ORDER - On or before May 1, 2012, the parties shall electronically file a joint stipulation for dismissal (or other dispositive stipulation) and shall submit to the Honorable Joseph F. Bataillon, at bataillon@ned.uscourts.gov, a draft ord er which will fully dispose of the case. If the case is being dismissed, the stipulation shall comply with Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a) and shall state whether the dismissal is with or without prejudice. Absent compliance with this order, this cas e (including all counterclaims and the like) may be dismissed without further notice. The pretrial conference and trial previously scheduled are cancelled upon therepresentation that this case is settled. (Dismissal Papers Deadline due by 5/1/2012.) Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TEL)
April 13, 2012 42 Featured Case ORDER OF DISMISSAL - This case is dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear their own costs, and complete record waived. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Poe v. U.S. Postal Service
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unites States Postal Service
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry Poe
Represented By: Steven M. Lathrop
Represented By: David M. O'Neill
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]