Coverall North America, Inc. v. Verica, L.L.C. et al

Defendant: Vicki Rhea and Verica, L.L.C.
Plaintiff: Coverall North America, Inc.
 
Case Number: 8:2011cv00255
Filed: July 25, 2011
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Referring Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 2, 2013 122 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER -Verica, L.L.C.s Motion to Compel (Filing No. 67 ) is granted in part and denied in part. Vericas motion is granted with regard to Interrogatory Nos. 4, 5, 6, and 24, and Request for Production Nos. 17, 18, and 19, as those interrogatories and requests were amended by the court, and denied in all other respects. On or before May 14, 2013, Coverall shall amend its answers and responses as provided in this order and shall serve a complete privilege log, filing notice of such service. The court will hold a telephone conference on May 23, at 10:00 a.m. for the purpose of reviewing the preparation of the case to date and scheduling the case to trial. Plaintiffs counsel shall initiate the conference with the undersigned magistrate judge and participating counsel. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (MKR)
November 15, 2013 139 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 138 Stipulation for Dismissal. The above-captioned matter is dismissed with prejudice, including all claims and counterclaims, with each party to pay their own attorneys fees and costs. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (AOA)
November 30, 2011 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER -The mediation stay allowed by the September 21, 2011, Mediation Reference Order (Filing No. 27 ) is hereby dissolved. Verica, L.L.C. shall have until December 15, 2011, to file an answer or otherwise respond to the plaintiffs Complaint (Fili ng No. 1 ). On or before January 5, 2012, the parties shall meet and confer and file a joint planning conference report in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f). ***Set/Reset All Deadlines: Verica, L.L.C. 12/15/2011.( Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 1/5/2012.) Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (MKR)
October 3, 2012 61 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER granting 60 Motion for Protective Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TRL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Coverall North America, Inc. v. Verica, L.L.C. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vicki Rhea
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verica, L.L.C.
Represented By: Richard A. DeWitt
Represented By: David J. Skalka
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coverall North America, Inc.
Represented By: Gary R. Batenhorst
Represented By: Trenten P. Bausch
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]