Strong v. Schenk Trucking, Inc. et al

Defendant: William Decker and Schenk Trucking, Inc.
Plaintiff: Bernard Strong
 
Case Number: 8:2011cv00295
Filed: August 29, 2011
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Referring Judge: F.A. Gossett
 
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 10, 2012 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting the 41 Motion to Quash Notice of Deposition. Eugene Kling shall not be deposed on May 11, 2012, as currently scheduled. The parties may reschedule the deposition of Mr. Kling for a later date. The other depositions set to occur in this case on May 11, 2012, may proceed as planned. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (MKR)
July 13, 2012 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER overruling the Defendant's Objection 52 to Order on Appeal to Magistrate Judge Order. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (MKR)
November 8, 2012 62 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE, granting 61 Motion to Extend Certain Progression Deadlines. The Pretrial Conference set for 1/17/2013 at 09:30 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett, and the Jury Trial set for 2/11/2013 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 3, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Judge Joseph F. Bataillon, remain as previously scheduled. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ARL,)
December 7, 2012 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER pursuant to an agreement reached by the parties during a settlement conference with the undersigned on December 7, 2012. On or before January 7, 2013, the parties shall electronically file a joint stipulation for dismissal and shall submit t o Joseph F. Bataillon, a draft order which will fully dispose of the case. Absent compliance with this order, this case (including all counterclaims and the like may) may be dismissed without further notice; and The pretrial conference set for January 17, 2013 is cancelled upon the representation that this case is settled. ***Set/Reset All Deadlines: ( Dismissal Papers Deadline due by 1/7/2013.) Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (MKR)
January 22, 2013 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL regarding 68 STIPULATION for Dismissal With Prejudice. This matter is dismissed with prejudice, each party to pay their own costs. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (MKR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Strong v. Schenk Trucking, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Decker
Represented By: David C. Mullin
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Culhane
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schenk Trucking, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Culhane
Represented By: David C. Mullin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernard Strong
Represented By: Maren L. Chaloupka
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]