United States of America v. Timothy T. Bezy Photography, Inc. et al

Defendant: Rich James, Timothy T. Bezy Photography, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, Olivia M. Cubeyro and Joseph Anderson
Plaintiff: United States of America
 
Case Number: 8:2011cv00348
Filed: October 7, 2011
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Referring Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
 
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7403 Suit to Enforce Federal Tax Lien
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 4, 2012 36 Featured Case ORDER ON STIPULATION ON LIEN PROPERTY granting 33 Stipulation regarding application of proceeds arising from sale of property. Unless otherwise ordered by the Court, Sarpy County and First Security Agency are excused from appearing before the Court or otherwise asserting their claims in the case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (copy to financial specialist)(ADB, )
May 4, 2012 37 Featured Case ORDER that this matter comes before the court after a telephone conference with counsel for the parties. The parties shall have to on or before July 30, 2012, to file any motions for summary judgment. The court will hold a telephone conference on August 7, 2012, at 10:00 a.m.for the purpose of revi ewing the preparation of the case to date and scheduling the case to trial. Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the conference with the undersigned magistrate judge and participating counsel. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (ADB)
June 15, 2012 40 Featured Case ORDER - Filing No. 29 was entered in error and is stricken; 2. This case remains assigned to District Judge Joseph Bataillon, with Magistrate Judge Thomas Thalken assigned to non-dispositive matters. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (MKR)
August 8, 2012 54 Featured Case ORDER granting 46 Motion to Extend; overruling 53 Objection. The parties shall have until October 1, 2012, to complete discovery. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TRL)
October 5, 2012 61 Featured Case ORDER that the plaintiff or any other party shall have until October 12, 2012, to file a motion for order of sale. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (ADB)
April 15, 2013 73 Featured Case ORDER that in accordance with the Stipulation for Voluntary Sale 72 , the case is stayed until 10/15/13. Timothy T. Bezy Photography, Inc. shall have until 10/15/13 to close a voluntary sale of the subject property. If a voluntary sale does not close before 10/15/13, the stay will expire automatically. If this occurs, the United States shall file a motion for an order of sale by 11/15/13. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (JSF)
November 21, 2013 75 Featured Case ORDER granting 74 Stipulation for Dismissal. The issues remaining after the Court's Memorandum and Order (Dkt. No. 59) and Judgment (Dkt. No. 60) namely, the foreclosure of the federal tax liens and whether the subject real property shoul d be sold are dismissed. The dismissal of the outstanding issues does not affect the validity of the Judgment against Bezy Photography (Dkt. No. 60). Each party shall bear its own costs and expenses incurred in this matter. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (ADB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: United States of America v. Timothy T. Bezy Photography, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rich James
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy T. Bezy Photography, Inc.
Represented By: Albert B. Kerkhove
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olivia M. Cubeyro
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Anderson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Sherra T. Wong
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]