Rodriguez v. Pruett

Plaintiff: Marie Rodriguez
Defendant: Ashley Pruett
Case Number: 8:2011cv00356
Filed: October 12, 2011
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Referring Judge: F.A. Gossett
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 16, 2012 18 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying the Defendant Ashley Pruett's 11 Motion to Dismiss; The Plaintiff, Marie Rodriguez's 14 Motion to Transfer is granted. The clerk is directed to transfer this case to the Western District of Oklahoma. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (MKR)
May 21, 2012 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The Plaintiff's Motion to Stay Transfer Pending Dismissal (Filing No. 19 ) is granted. The Clerk is directed to stay the transfer of this case to the Western District of Oklahoma. The parties must file a stipulation for dismissal on or before June 29, 2012. ***Set/Reset All Deadlines: (Dismissal Papers Deadline due by 6/29/2012.) Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (TEL)
July 2, 2012 22 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The parties' Joint Stipulation for Dismissal with prejudice is approved 21 . This action is dismissed with prejudice; and The parties will pay their own costs. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (MKR)
April 3, 2012 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE- The plaintiff shall show cause why this case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. The showing of cause shall be filed electronically on or before the close of business on May 3, 2012. Show Cause Deadline set for 5/3/2012. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (Copy mailed to Ashley Pruett)(MKR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. Pruett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Rodriguez
Represented By: John E. Corrigan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Pruett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]