Kucera et al v. United States of America

Plaintiff: Linda L. Larsen and Terrence G. Kucera
Defendant: United States of America
 
Case Number: 8:2011cv00363
Filed: October 17, 2011
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Referring Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
 
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7422 IRS: Refund Taxes
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 13, 2012 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - On or before October 17, 2012, the parties shall electronically file a joint stipulation for dismissal (or other dispositive stipulation) and shall submit to the Honorable Joseph F. Bataillon, at bataillon@ned.uscourts.gov, a draft or der which will fully dispose of the case. If the case is being dismissed, the stipulation shall comply with Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a) and shall state whether the dismissal is with or without prejudice. Absent compliance with this order, the court wi ll hold a telephone conference on October 17, 2012, at 10:00 a.m. Counsel for the United States of America shall initiate the conference with the undersigned magistrate judge and participating counsel. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (GJG)
November 2, 2012 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 49 Stipulation for Dismissal. The Kuceras' claims against the United States in the above-captioned case (Doc. 1) be dismissed with prejudice, and the United States's counterclaim against the Kuceras (Doc. 13, United Sta tes' Counter-Claim Counts I-II) be dismissed with prejudice, the United States and the Kuceras to bear their own costs, including any possible attorney fees or other expenses of litigation. The claims brought by the United States against Aaron Smeall and Matthew Knoblauch, and their respective claims against the United States,are not dismissed. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (ADB)
November 28, 2012 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL granting 55 Stipulation for Dismissal. The United States and Matthew Knoblauch ("Knoblauch") stipulate that Knoblauch's claims against the United States in the above-captioned case (Doc. # 28 ) be dismissed w ith prejudice, and the United States' counterclaim against Knoblauch (Doc. # 13 , United States' Counter-Claim Count III) be dismissed with prejudice, Each party agrees to bear its own litigation expenses including costs and attorney's fees. This case is dismissed. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (GJG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Kucera et al v. United States of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda L. Larsen
Represented By: James F. Cann
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrence G. Kucera
Represented By: James F. Cann
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]