Oppong-Peprah v. Holder et al

Respondent: Warden of Immigration Detention Facility, Janet Napolitano, Eric Holder and Scott Baniecke
Petitioner: Kwadwo Oppong-Peprah
 
Case Number: 8:2011cv00383
Filed: November 10, 2011
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Referring Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
 
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 2, 2012 21 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Respondents' Motion to Dismiss (filing no. 18 ) is granted. Petitioner Kwadwo Oppong-Peprahs Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (filing no. 1 ) is denied in all respects and this action is dismissed with prejudice. All other pending motions are denied as moot. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed/e-mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
December 7, 2011 5 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Upon initial review of the Petition (filing no. 1 ), the court preliminarily determines that Petitioner's claims, as set forth in this Memorandum and Order, are potentially cognizable in federal court. The Clerk of the c ourt is directed to mail copies of this Memorandum and Order and the Petition to Respondents and the United States Attorney for the District of Nebraska by regular first-class mail. By January 23, 2012, Respondent shall file a motion for summary judg ment or state court records in support of an answer. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: January 23, 2012: deadline for Respondent to file state court records in support o f answer or motion for summary judgment. If Respondent elects to file an answer, the procedures as set out shall be followed by Respondent and Petitioner. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: February 20, 2011: check for Respondent to file answer and separate brief. No discovery shall be undertaken without leave of the court. Petitioner's Application for Order to Show Cause and Proposed Order (filing nos. 3 and 4 ) are denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed/e-mailed to pro se party and as directed)(GJG)
December 21, 2011 9 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Petitioner's Motion to Appoint Counsel (filing no. 6 ) is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed/e-mailed to pro se party)(GJG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Oppong-Peprah v. Holder et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden of Immigration Detention Facility
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Janet Napolitano
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Eric Holder
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Scott Baniecke
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kwadwo Oppong-Peprah
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]