Davlin v. Miller et al

Plaintiff: Clifford J. Davlin
Defendant: Tim Miller and O. Perez
 
Case Number: 8:2011cv00396
Filed: November 21, 2011
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Referring Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Lyle E. Strom
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 1, 2012 10 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER-Plaintiffs Eighth Amendment claims against defendants in their official capacities are dismissed without prejudice. To obtain service of process on defendants, plaintiff must complete and return the summons forms which the clerk of the court will provide. The clerk of the court shall send TWO (2) summons forms and TWO (2) USM-285 forms (for service on defendants in their individual capacities only) to plaintiff together with a copy of this Memorandum and Order. Plaintiff is granted an extension of time until 120 days from the date of this order to complete service of process. ***Pro Se Case Management Deadlines: ( Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 5/29/2012.May29, 2012: Check for completion of service of summons. ) Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed/e-mailed to pro se party as directed)(MKR)
April 2, 2012 21 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying the Plaintiff's 2 12 17 and 20 Motions to Appoint Counsel. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
September 11, 2012 27 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION- regarding the defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment 23 . The Court finds that Davlin has failed to exhaust his NDCS administrative remedies prior to filing and this matter will be dismissed without prejudice. A separate order will be entered in accordance with this memorandum opinion. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
December 14, 2012 30 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER- Plaintiffs November 14, 2012, letter, construed as a motion to stop payment of filing fee (Filing No. 29 ), is denied. The clerk of the court is directed to send a copy of this Memorandum and Order to the appropriate official at plaintiffs institution. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party and as directed)(MKR)
December 9, 2011 8 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting the Plaintiff's 5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff Clifford J. Davlin shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $17.18 by January 9, 2012, unless an enlargement of time is granted in response to a written motion. The clerk of the court is directed to send a copy of this order to the appropriate official at plaintiffs institution. Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 1/9/2012: initial partial filing fee payment due. Plaintiff shall review the "Notice Regarding Summons Forms" attached to this Order. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copies mailed to pro se party and as directed)(MKR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Davlin v. Miller et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifford J. Davlin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Miller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O. Perez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]