Oppenheim v. Lampert

Plaintiff: Alexander W. Oppenheim
Defendant: Keith M. Lampert
Case Number: 8:2011cv00437
Filed: December 19, 2011
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Referring Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Lyle E. Strom
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 24, 2012 15 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Defendant's Motion to Redact (Filing No. 10 ) is granted. The clerk of the court is directed to seal the Complaint (Filing No. 1 ) and plaintiff's Affidavit and Proof of Service (Filing Nos. 6 and 6 - (1)). A ll further pleadings, including the amended complaint discussed herein, shall be served upon defendant's counsel and shall not include defendant's personal identifying information. Plaintiff's Motion to Amend (Filing No. 13 ) and defendant's Stipulation (Filing No. 14 ) are granted. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint in accordance with this Memorandum and Order on or before January 30, 2012. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy e-mailed to pro se party) (AOA)
April 24, 2012 25 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion to Correct Errors (Filing No. 22 ) and Motion to Correct Case Code (Filing No. 23 ) are denied. Plaintiff's Motion to Seal Amended Complaint (Filing No. 24 ) is granted. The Clerk of the court is directed to seal plaintiff's Amended Complaint (i.e. Filing No. 16 ). Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy e-mailed to pro se party) (AOA)
January 10, 2012 8 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's motion to amend (FilingNo. 5 ) is granted. Plaintiff shall file his amended complaint on or before January 17, 2012. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy e-mailed to pro se party) (AOA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oppenheim v. Lampert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander W. Oppenheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith M. Lampert
Represented By: Thomas O. Mumgaard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.