Williams v. Raynor Rensch & Pfieffer et al

Defendant: Raynor Rensch & Pfieffer, Richard J. Rensch, Sean P. Rensch, John Stuck, Unknown Defendants, Kelle J. Westland, Bellevue Police Department, John Brazda, Dave Bruck, City of Bellevue Nebraska, City of Omaha Nebraska, Douglas County Correctional Center, Mark Foxall, Terry Haddock, Patrick M. Heng, John J. Kohl, Jeffrey Newton, Omaha Police Department, William E. Pfeiffer, John P. Raynor and Raynor & Raynor
Plaintiff: Shannon Williams
Case Number: 8:2011cv00446
Filed: December 30, 2011
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Referring Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Lyle E. Strom
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 11, 2013 116 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER on the Plaintiff's untimely Notice of Appeal of Memorandum Opinion and Order and Judgment 89 . Plaintiff's Notice of Appeal of the Court's March 29, 2012, Memorandum Opinion and Order and Judgment is untimely. The Clerk of the court shall not process this Notice of Appeal. With regard to plaintiffs Notice of Appeal of the Courts December 14, 2012, Memorandum and Order, plaintiff shall have until March 8, 2013, to either submit the $455.00 appellate filing fee or a motion to proceed IFP, with the required affidavit. If plaintiff takes no action, his appeal will not be processed. Plaintiff is reminded that the Prison Litigation Reform Act makes the prisoner liable for payment of the full $45 5.00 appellate filing fee regardless of the outcome of the appeal. The clerk of the court shall not process plaintiffs Notice of Appeal of the Courts December 14, 2012, Memorandum and Order (Filing No. 91 ), until further order of the Court. The clerk of the court is directed to forward a copy of this Memorandum and Order to the parties and to the Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party and as directed)(MKR)
June 20, 2013 124 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER on the remand from the Eighth Circuit. For the reasons discussed within this order, the Court will reenter its November 26, 2012, Memorandum and Order, and plaintiff shall have until June 28, 2013, to file an amended complaint. Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration (Filing No. 69 ) is granted. The clerk of the court is directed to re-open this matter. The clerk of the court is directed to send a copy of this Memorandum and Order to the District Court of Douglas Cou nty, Nebraska, and to take all necessary steps to inform the Court that the previous order to remand is no longer in effect. Plaintiff shall have until July 15, 2013, in which to file an amended complaint containing all claims, including all federa l claims, against all defendants. In the event that plaintiff fails to do so, this matter will proceed on the claims set forth in the Amended Complaint (Filing No. 22 ) only. Defendants shall file an answer or other responsive pleading no later th an August 5, 2013. Defendants' Motions to Withdraw (Filing Nos. 77 and 78 ) are granted. Counsel for defendants is permitted to withdraw, as the Assistant United States Attorney has already made her appearance on behalf of defendants Bruck, Stuck, and Brazda. The Motion to Dismiss filed by Bellevue, Nebraska, (Filing No. 87 ), plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration (Filing No. 93 ), plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint (Filing No. 101 ), defendants' Motion to Strike (Filing No. 104 ), and plaintiff's Motions to Strike Pleadings (Filing Nos. 114 and 115 ), are denied in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. ***Set All Deadlines: ( Amended Complaint due by 7/15/2013.) Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party and to District Court of Douglas County, Nebraska ) (MKR)
January 14, 2014 176 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Plaintiff's Motion to Reopen Time for Appeal (Filing No. 139 ) is granted in part. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint (Filing No. 141 ), is granted. Plaintiff shall have 21 d ays from the date of this order in which to file an amended complaint containing all claims against all defendants. In the event that plaintiff fails to do so, this matter will proceed on the claims set forth in the operative complaint (Filing No. [2 2]). Defendants shall have 21 days from the date of the filing of plaintiff's amended complaint in which to file an answer or other responsive pleading. If no amended complaint is filed, defendants shall have 21 days from the expiration of the deadline set forth in paragraph 3 above in which to file an answer or other responsive pleading. Defendants' Motions to Dismiss and/or for Summary Judgment (Filing Nos. 127 , 129 , 131 , 133 , 135 , and 137 ) are denied without prejudice . Plaintiff's Motions to Strike (Filing Nos. 142 and 143 ) are denied as moot. Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment (Filing No. 144 ) is denied. Plaintiff's Motion for Proof of Service (Filing No. 148 ) is denied as moot. D efendant Haddock's Motion to Extend Deadline (Filing No. 151 ) is denied as moot. Plaintiff's Motions to Oppose Defendant Haddock's Motion to Extend Deadline (Filing Nos. 163 and 167 ) are denied as moot. Plaintiff's Motion for Copies (Filing No. 162 ) is denied. If plaintiff requires a copy of the local rules or other documents, he should contact the clerk of the court to determine the proper method of requesting and paying for copies. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL )
January 31, 2014 182 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER- Plaintiff's 178 MOTION for Docket Sheet is denied. Plaintiff's MOTION for Clarification 179 and 180 are granted to the extent that this Memorandum and Order provides plaintiff with clarification and are otherwise denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
February 25, 2014 192 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER- Defendants' Joint Motion to Stay Discovery (Filing No. 185 ) is granted. Discovery is stayed in this matter until the Court enters a progression order or otherwise permits discovery. Defendants' Joint Motion for Extension of Time (Filing No. 191 ) is granted. Defendants' answer or other responsive pleading is due no later than March 18, 2014. ***Set/Reset All Deadlines: John Brazda 3/18/2014; Dave Bruck 3/18/2014; City of Bellevue, Nebraska 3/18/2014; City of Omaha Nebraska 3/18/2014; Douglas County 3/18/2014; Mark Foxall 3/18/2014; Terry Haddock 3/18/2014; Patrick M. Heng 3/18/2014; John J. Kohl 3/18/2014; Jeffrey Newton 3/18/2014; Omaha Police Department 3/18/2014; William E. Pfeiffer 3/18/2014; John P. Raynor 3/18/2014; Raynor Rensch & Pfieffer 3/18/2014; Richard J. Rensch 3/18/2014; Sean P. Rensch 3/18/2014; John Stuck 3/18/2014. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (MKR)
March 29, 2012 58 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding the Plaintiff's Motion to Remove Facts from the Complaint 15 , Objections to Notice of Removal 16 and 21 and Motion to Dismiss without prejudice specific allegations 41 . In light of plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint, theCourt lacks subject matter jurisdiction and remand is appropriate. A separate order will be entered in accordance with this memorandum opinion. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed/e-mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
November 26, 2012 82 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER- Plaintiffs Motion for Reconsideration (Filing No. 69 ) is granted. The clerk of the court is directed to send a copy of this Memorandum and Order to the District Court of Douglas County, Nebraska, and to take all necessary step s to inform that court that the previous order to remand is no longer in effect. Plaintiff shall have until December 20, 2012, in which to file an amended complaint containing all claims, including all federal claims, against all defendants. In the event that plaintiff fails to do so, this matter will proceed on the claims set forth in the Amended Complaint (Filing No. 22 ) only. Defendants shall file an answer or other responsive pleading no later than January 22, 2013. Defendants Motions to Withdraw (Filing Nos. 77 and 78 ) are granted. Counsel for defendants is permitted to withdraw, as the Assistant United States Attorney has already made her appearance on behalf of defendants Bruck, Stuck, and Brazda. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party and District Court of Douglas County, Nebraska as directed) (MKR)
December 14, 2012 83 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Notice of Appeal 65 is untimely and moot. The clerk of the court shall not process the appeal to the Court of Appeals. The clerk of the court is directed to forward a copy of this Memorandum and Order to th e parties and to the Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals. Plaintiff is reminded that he has until December 20, 2012, in which to file an amended complaint in accordance with the Court's previous Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party and submitted to Court of Appeals as directed)(MKR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Raynor Rensch & Pfieffer et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raynor Rensch & Pfieffer
Represented By: Richard J. Rensch
Represented By: Sean P. Rensch
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard J. Rensch
Represented By: Richard J. Rensch
Represented By: Sean P. Rensch
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean P. Rensch
Represented By: Richard J. Rensch
Represented By: Sean P. Rensch
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Stuck
Represented By: Harvey B. Cooper
Represented By: Ryan M. Kunhart
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Defendants
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelle J. Westland
Represented By: Richard J. Rensch
Represented By: Sean P. Rensch
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bellevue Police Department
Represented By: Ryan M. Kunhart
Represented By: Harvey B. Cooper
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Brazda
Represented By: Ryan M. Kunhart
Represented By: Harvey B. Cooper
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Bruck
Represented By: Thomas O. Mumgaard
Represented By: William J. Acosta-Trejo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Bellevue Nebraska
Represented By: Ryan M. Kunhart
Represented By: Harvey B. Cooper
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Omaha Nebraska
Represented By: Thomas O. Mumgaard
Represented By: William J. Acosta-Trejo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas County Correctional Center
Represented By: Sandra K. Connolly
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Foxall
Represented By: Sandra K. Connolly
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Haddock
Represented By: Richard J. Rensch
Represented By: Sean P. Rensch
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick M. Heng
Represented By: Richard J. Rensch
Represented By: Sean P. Rensch
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John J. Kohl
Represented By: Richard J. Rensch
Represented By: Sean P. Rensch
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Newton
Represented By: Sandra K. Connolly
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omaha Police Department
Represented By: William J. Acosta-Trejo
Represented By: Thomas O. Mumgaard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William E. Pfeiffer
Represented By: Richard J. Rensch
Represented By: Sean P. Rensch
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John P. Raynor
Represented By: Richard J. Rensch
Represented By: Sean P. Rensch
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raynor & Raynor
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]