United States of America v. $33,984.00 in United States Currency

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $33,984.00 in United States Currency
 
Case Number: 8:2012cv00065
Filed: February 14, 2012
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Referring Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
 
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 28:1345 Complaint for Forfeiture
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 14, 2012 18 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER- Bowens motion to dismiss and amended motion to dismiss, Filing Nos. 8 and 16 , are denied. The claimant is given 20 days to file an answer. Plaintiffs motion to strike claimants motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim, Filing No. 11 , is denied as moot pursuant to Filing No. 14 , Claimants Verified Claim to Property.Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (MKR)
November 27, 2012 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the plaintiff's Motion to Strike 24 is deemed a Motion to Compel and is granted. Eric Bowen shall present himself for deposition to be rescheduled at the convenience of the parties counsel on or before January 18, 2013, or show cau se why his Answer and Claim should not be stricken for failure to comply with this courts orders. The deadline for the parties to prepare a proposed final pretrial conference order in accordance with NECivR 16.2 and submit it to the assigned magistrate judge is extended until after resolution of the plaintiffs motion. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (MKR)
April 5, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting the plaintiff's 33 Motion to Strike. The Clerk of Court is ordered to strike Bowens Answer, Filing No. 20 and Claim, Filing No. 14 , and enter a Clerks entry of default against Eric Bowen. The findings and recommendation of the magistrate judge 34 is adopted in its entirety. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: United States of America v. $33,984.00 in United States Currency
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Nancy A. Svoboda
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $33,984.00 in United States Currency
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]