United States of America v. Luther et al

Defendant: Nebraska Department of Revenue, Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC, TAG Virgin Islands, Inc., Dresdner Kleinwort Holdings, Inc., Scott J. Esparza, Barry Feiner, Gary Fromm, Joseph M. Haller, Richard Hierons, Kleinwort Benson (USA), Inc., Gerald C. Korth, Laura Dodge Luther, MSW Capital, LLC, Michael S. Luther, Cyclone Assets, Accredited Collection Service, Inc. and Atelier Partners
Plaintiff: United States of America
 
Case Number: 8:2012cv00080
Filed: February 23, 2012
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Referring Judge: F.A. Gossett
 
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7403 Suit to Enforce Federal Tax Lien
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 24, 2013 100 Featured Case ORDER granting 99 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The Clerk of Court shall terminate the appearances of Patrick Betterman and the Law Offices of W. Patrick Betterman as counsel of record for Michael Luther and shall terminate future notices to Pa trick Betterman and the Law Offices of W. Patrick Betterman in this matter. This matter will be stayed until March 4, 2013, to allow Michael Luther to obtain new counsel. By or before March 4, 2013, Michael Luther shall have new counsel enter an appearance on his behalf or, alternatively, advise the Court that he wishes to proceed pro se. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (JAB)
May 21, 2013 122 Featured Case ORDER - Defendant Michael Luther's Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer and Counterclaim (filing 116 ) and Defendant Laura Dodge Luther's Motion for Leave to File First Amended Answer and Counterclaims (filing 117 ) are granted. Michael Luther and Laura Dodge Luther shall file their proposed amended answers by or before May 23, 2013. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (AOA)
April 11, 2012 13 Featured Case ORDER - The Answer (Filing No. 5 ) of the Defendant, State of Nebraska, Department of Revenue, considered as a motion to dismiss a party, is granted; and this action is dismissed as against the Defendant, State of Nebraska, Department of Revenue, with prejudice, with each party to pay its own costs. Party Nebraska Department of Revenue terminated. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (TEL)
June 20, 2013 143 Featured Case ORDER - Laura Dodge Luther's Motion for Protective Order (filing 118 )is granted, in part. By or before July 5, 2013, the parties shall jointly submit a proposed protective order which incorporates the rulings delineated herein. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (AOA)
July 16, 2013 157 Featured Case PROTECTIVE ORDER - Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (AOA)
September 23, 2013 182 Featured Case ORDER - The Motion to Withdraw as Counsel (filing 181 ) is granted. Mr. Betterman shall immediately serve copies of this Order on Michael Luther and thereafter file proof of service showing compliance with this Order, listing the names and add resses of the persons to whom notice was sent. Mr. Betterman will not be relieved of applicable duties to the Court, Mr. Luther and opposing counsel until proof of service is filed. Upon Mr. Betterman's submission of proof of service as described in Paragraph 2 of this Order, the Clerk of Court shall terminate Mr. Betterman's appearance as counsel and cease further notices to him in this matter. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (AOA)
November 19, 2013 192 Featured Case ORDER - The parties shall mediate this case by or before January 15, 2014. Motions for summary judgment or other dispositive motions shall be filed by January 20, 2014. Pretrial disclosures shall be made no later than March 28, 2014. Motions i n limine shall be filed by or before April 11, 2014. The Final Pretrial Conference with the undersigned Magistrate Judge is set for May 19, 2014 at 9:30 a.m., in chambers, 111 South 18th Plaza, Suite 2210, Roman L. Hruska United States Courthouse, Omaha, Nebraska. A non-jury trial is set to commence, at the Court's call, during the week of June 17, 2014, in Omaha, Nebraska, before the Honorable Laurie Smith Camp, Chief United States District Judge. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (AOA)
March 13, 2014 217 Featured Case ORDER - Defendant Gerald Korth's Motion to Compel (filing 203 ) is denied. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (AOA)
April 1, 2014 219 Featured Case ORDER OF DISMISSAL - The Stipulation and Joint Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice (Filing No. 218 ) is approved. All claims and counterclaims between the Stipulating Parties in the above-captioned matter are dismissed with prejudice. The Stipulating Parties will pay their own costs and attorney's fees. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (AOA)
April 21, 2014 229 Featured Case ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - On or before May 5, 2014, each party with any pending claim will file a memorandum showing cause why the claim should not be dismissed by this Court due to lack of subject-matter jurisdiction, and why this Court should not enter a final judgment in the above-captioned matter. Show Cause Deadline set for 5/9/2014. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (AOA)
May 12, 2014 230 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Any pending claims against the United States in the above-captioned matter are dismissed with prejudice. Any pending claims between defendants in the above-captioned matter are dismissed without prejudice. Mic hael S. Luther's Motion to Dismiss (Filing No. 220 ); Laura Dodge Luther's joinder to Michael S. Luther's Motion to Dismiss (Filing No. 223 ); and the Objections submitted by Defendant Gerald C. Korth (Filing No. 224 ) and Defendant Atelier Partners (Filing No. 225 ) are denied as moot. A separate judgment will follow. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (TCL )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: United States of America v. Luther et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nebraska Department of Revenue
Represented By: Amber L. Coulter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAG Virgin Islands, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dresdner Kleinwort Holdings, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott J. Esparza
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry Feiner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Fromm
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph M. Haller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Hierons
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kleinwort Benson (USA), Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald C. Korth
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Dodge Luther
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MSW Capital, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael S. Luther
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cyclone Assets
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accredited Collection Service, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atelier Partners
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Ellen K. Weis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]