Prism Technologies v. United States Cellular Corporation

Plaintiff: Prism Technologies
Defendant: United States Cellular Corporation
 
Case Number: 8:2012cv00125
Filed: April 4, 2012
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Lyle E. Strom
Referring Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
December 18, 2013 166 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - U.S. Cellular will produce the following RFPs within ten business days: 1, 2, 3, 11, 12, 16, 19, 20, 28, 37, 38, 39, 40, 41, 42, 55, 59, 60, 62, 63, 79, 96. U.S. Cellular will set a date certain when the following RFPs will be delivered to Prism: 22, 23, 24, 26, 27, 30, 32, 33, 34. The Court will wait to rule on these RFPs. The following RFCs are also denied without prejudice a this time: 13 and 66. Prism has five business days from the filing of this order to su pplement its original RFPs. U.S. Cellular has five business days to produce those requested documents after the request is made. The following RFPs are denied without prejudice: 56, 88, 25, 29, 31. On or before January 17, 2014, the parties shall meet and confer in good faith to "identify the proper custodians, search terms, and proper time frame" in order for Prism to create specific production requests according to the e-discovery order. Then, Prism will request production of specific discovery within ten business days of the parties' meet and confer. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (MKR)
December 27, 2013 170 Featured Case ORDER granting the defendant's 168 Motion to Extend. Defendant shall have until January 9, 2014, in which to produce certain documents to comply with the Court's order of December 18, 2013. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (MKR)
January 13, 2014 174 Featured Case ORDER granting the defendant's 173 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Savan N. Vaghani of the law firm of Sidley Austin, LLP, is deemed withdrawn as counsel of record for defendant. His name shall be removed from CM/ECF and he shall no longer receive notice of filings in this case. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (MKR)
July 3, 2012 31 Featured Case ORDER granting the parties Joint 30 Motion for enlargement of time to submit the parties' planning conference. The parties shall have fourteen days after the date of the defendant's answer to file their Rule 26(f) report after the Court rules on defendant's motion to dismiss. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (MKR)
September 6, 2012 33 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - U.S. Cellular's motion to dismiss (Filing No. 27 ) is granted, as follows: 1) Prism will file an amended complaint with the Court setting forth adequate infringement allegations on or before September 21, 2012; 2) Should Prism fail to file a timely amended complaint, this action will be dismissed. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (GJG)
November 28, 2012 49 Featured Case ORDER granting the defendant's 48 Motion to Extend. Defendant shall have until December 3, 2012, in which to respond to plaintiff's motion for protective order. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (MKR)
December 4, 2012 53 Featured Case ORDER granting the Defendant's 52 Motion to Extend. Defendant shall have until December 10, 2012, in which to respond to plaintiff's motion for protective order. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (MKR)
February 6, 2013 71 Featured Case ORDER granting Defendant's 70 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. William M. Chang of the law firm of Sidley Austin, LLP, is deemed withdrawn as counsel of record for defendant. His name shall be removed from CM/ECF and he shall no longer receive notice of filings in this case. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (MKR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Prism Technologies v. United States Cellular Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prism Technologies
Represented By: Paul Andre
Represented By: Mark A. Baghdassarian
Represented By: Andre J. Bahou
Represented By: Jonathan S. Caplan
Represented By: Marcus A. Colucci
Represented By: Michael C. Cox
Represented By: Daniel J. Fischer
Represented By: Lisa Kobialka
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Cellular Corporation
Represented By: William M. Chang
Represented By: Michael K. Huffer
Represented By: Amy M. Locher
Represented By: Richard J. O'Brien
Represented By: Savan N. Vaghani
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]