United States of America v. $10,000.00 in United States Currency

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $10,000.00 in United States Currency
Case Number: 8:2012cv00140
Filed: April 25, 2012
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: John M. Gerrard
Referring Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 28:1345 Complaint for Forfeiture
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 22, 2012 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The motion to strike (filing 13 ) filed by the United States of America is granted. The portions of Herrera's answer (filing 11 ) that purport to raise a motion to dismiss under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) are stricken. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (TEL)
October 17, 2012 22 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge - upon consent of parties, this case is transferred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart for final disposition. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (AOA)
August 5, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 28 Joint Email Motion to continue trial. Non-Jury Trial continued to 8/29/2013 at 10:00 AM Courtroom 1 (Special Proceedings), Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plz, Omaha, NE before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. No further continuances will be granted absent a substantial showing of good cause. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
August 28, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 31 Oral Motion to Continue Trial.1) The trial of this case is continued pending further order of the court.2) A telephonic conference with the undersigned magistrate judge will be held on September 13, 2013 at 10:00 a.m. to discuss trial scheduling. Counsel for the claimant shall place the call.3) The claimant is hereby advised that if this case cannot be re-scheduled for trial on September 13, 2013 because the claimant's whereabouts remain unknown at that time, his claim will be dismissed for want of prosecution and judgment will be entered in favor of the government. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
October 24, 2013 43 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT - In accordance with court's factual findings and conclusions of law stated on the record at the close of trial, Judgment is hereby entered providing that the defendant property is forfeited to the United States; all right, title, or in terest in or to the defendant property is forfeited to the United States; all right, title, or interest in or to the defendant property held by any person or entity is hereby forever barred and foreclosed; and the Marshal shall dispose of the defendant property in accordance with the law. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (1 Certified copy to USM)(JAB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $10,000.00 in United States Currency
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Nancy A. Svoboda
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $10,000.00 in United States Currency
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]