Pinkerton v. Unum Group

Plaintiff: Roni Pinkerton
Defendant: Unum Group
 
Case Number: 8:2012cv00158
Filed: May 8, 2012
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Referring Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
 
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
September 27, 2012 13 Featured Case ORDER that t he plaintiff shall have to on or before October 11, 2012, to file an amended complaint to rename the defendant. The defendant shall have to on or before November 1, 2012, to file an answer to the amended complaint, otherwise the court will deem the May 21, 2012, Answer to be the defendant's answer to the amended complaint. The defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment on or before November 20, 2012. The plaintiff shall have to on or before December 17, 2012, to file a response to any motion for summary judgment previously filed and to file a motion for summary judgment. The defendant may file a reply in support of its own summary judgment motion and a response to the plaintiff's summary judgment mo tion on or before January 11, 2013. Within fourteen days following the court's ruling on the parties' cross motions for summary judgment, the plaintiff shall arrange a telephone conference with opposing counsel and the undersigned magistrate judge for the purpose of scheduling the matter to conclusion. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (ADB)
November 19, 2012 16 Featured Case ORDER that on or before December 19, 2012, the parties shall electronically file a joint stipulation for dismissal. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (ADB)
November 21, 2012 18 Featured Case ORDER granting 17 Stipulation for Dismissal. The case is hereby dismissed with prejudice, with each party to pay their own costs and attorney fees. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (ADB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Pinkerton v. Unum Group
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roni Pinkerton
Represented By: Mandy L. Strigenz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unum Group
Represented By: Steven D. Davidson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]