White v. Kellogg Company et al

Defendant: Local 50 G Bakery, Confectionary, Tobacco Workers & Grain Millers International Union and Kellogg Company
Plaintiff: Jeramia White
 
Case Number: 8:2012cv00164
Filed: May 9, 2012
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Referring Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 9, 2012 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint (FilingNo. 10 ) is granted. The plaintiff shall have until July 16, 2012, to file the second amended complaint. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (GJG)
October 30, 2012 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 27 Motion for Protective Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TRL)
January 16, 2013 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that upon notice of successful mediation given to the magistrate judge on January 16, 2013, by Terry A. White, attorney for the plaintiff, that on or before March 4, 2013, the parties shall electronically file a joint stipulation for dismissal. The planning conference previously scheduled is cancelled. Defendants' 40 Motion to Amend and 41 Motion to Amend are terminated as moot. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (ADB)
March 6, 2013 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL granting 47 Stipulation for Dismissal. This matter should be and is dismissed, with prejudice. Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1). Each of the parties is to bear its own attorney fees and costs. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (copy to bankruptcy court)(ADB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: White v. Kellogg Company et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Local 50 G Bakery, Confectionary, Tobacco Workers & Grain Millers International Union
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kellogg Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeramia White
Represented By: Katherine A. Busch
Represented By: Terry A. White
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]