Lombardo v. Barrett Property Management et al

Plaintiff: Marc Lombardo
Defendant: John C. Barrett, Verla Kay Barrett and Barrett Property Management
 
Case Number: 8:2012cv00189
Filed: May 25, 2012
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Referring Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:3601 Fair Housing Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 8, 2012 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE that Attorney John Chatelian is to register for the Systemand pay the biennial assessment. Show Cause Deadline set for 8/23/2012.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (ADB)
October 29, 2012 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: The court will continue the telephone planning conference to December 27, 2012, at 10:00 a.m., following a scheduled mediation on December 10, 2012. Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the conference with the undersigned magistrate judge. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TCL )
December 7, 2012 24 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER granting 23 Motion for Protective Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TCL )
December 27, 2012 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that on or before January 15, 2013, the parties shall electronically file a joint stipulation for dismissal. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (ADB)
May 29, 2012 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 1 Motion to Restrict pursuant to the E-Government Act. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (ADB, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Lombardo v. Barrett Property Management et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc Lombardo
Represented By: Scott P. Moore
Represented By: Todd A. West
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John C. Barrett
Represented By: Matthew P. Saathoff
Represented By: John C. Chatelain
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verla Kay Barrett
Represented By: John C. Chatelain
Represented By: Matthew P. Saathoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barrett Property Management
Represented By: John C. Chatelain
Represented By: Matthew P. Saathoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]