Boehm v. United States Postal Service

Defendant: United States Postal Service
Plaintiff: Keri Boehm
 
Case Number: 8:2012cv00198
Filed: June 11, 2012
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: F.A. Gossett
 
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 39:409 Postal Service
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 5, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 25 Motion to Amend. Plaintiff shall file its Amended Complaint by or before March 7, 2013. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ADB)
July 8, 2013 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying the Plaintiff's 54 Motion for Leave to file a sur-reply brief as premature at this time. Plaintiff may renew its motion for leave after Defendant's submission of its reply brief. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (MKR)
November 12, 2013 72 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment 41 is denied and Defendant's Cross Motion for Summary Judgment 45 is granted. Judgment will be entered by separate document. Plaintiff's Motion to Allow Use of Testimony of Daniel Greenfield, David W. Black, Sr. and J.J. Jackson for Impeachment Purposes 57 and Defendant's Motion to Strike 61 are denied as moot. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (JSF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Boehm v. United States Postal Service
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Postal Service
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keri Boehm
Represented By: Maynard H. Weinberg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]