United States of America v. $10,110.00 in United States Currency

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $10,110.00 in United States Currency
Claimant: Deverick A Simpson
Case Number: 8:2012cv00200
Filed: June 12, 2012
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Referring Judge: F.A. Gossett
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 28:1345 Complaint for Forfeiture
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 8, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Magistrate F.A. Gossett's Findings and Recommendation (Filing No. 31 ) are adopted in their entirety. The Defendant's Motion to Suppress Statements (Filing No. 21 ) is granted, in accordance with the Findings and Recommendation. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (AOA)
June 19, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: TRIAL PREPARATION (CIVIL NON-JURY TRIAL). Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (JB)
July 5, 2013 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving 35 Joint Stipulation. 1. The United States Marshals Services is directed to return the Defendant Property, $10,110.00 in United States Currency, to the Claimant, Deverick A. Simpson, together with interest accruing thereon from January 10, 2012, to date of payment.2. The Plaintiff and the Claimant shall each pay their own costs and attorney's fees incurred as a result of this lawsuit.3. Upon receipt of the tendered funds, Mr. Bloom shall file a notice ind icating receipt of the funds.4. Within thirty days of this Order, the parties shall file a joint stipulation for dismissal which will fully dispose of the case. Absent compliance with this order, this case may be dismissed without further notice. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (JAB) Modified on 7/5/2013 to reflect 1 certified copy to USM. (JAB)
August 6, 2013 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of DISMISSAL - The parties' Stipulation for Dismissal with prejudice (Filing No. 38 ) is approved. The above-entitled action will be dismissed with prejudice. The Court will not assess costs or attorneys' fees in this case. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (GJG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $10,110.00 in United States Currency
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Nancy A. Svoboda
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $10,110.00 in United States Currency
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Deverick A Simpson
Represented By: Brent M. Bloom
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]