Manche et al v. Meis

Plaintiff: Edwin L. Manche and Marla D. Manche
Defendant: Jean M. Meis
Case Number: 8:2012cv00217
Filed: June 25, 2012
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Referring Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 11, 2012 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting in its entirety the 10 Findings and Recommendation of the magistrate judge. The plaintiff's Complaint, 1 is dismissed without prejudice, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m). Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (MKR)
August 8, 2012 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - On or before August 23, 2012, attorney Scott J. Mann shall register or show cause by written affidavit why he cannot comply with the rules of the court. Failure to comply with this order will result in Mr. Mann being removed as counsel of record for the plaintiffs. Show Cause Deadline set for 8/23/2012. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (Copies mailed non-registered attorneys)(AOA)
August 8, 2012 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE- On or before August 23, 2012, attorney Michael J. Wyatt shall register or show cause by written affidavit why he cannot comply with the rules of the court. Failure to comply with this order will result in Mr. Wyatt being removed as counsel of record for the plaintiffs. Show Cause Deadline set for 8/23/2012. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (Copies mailed to non-registered attorneys)(AOA)
August 29, 2012 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Scott J. Mann is stricken as an attorney of record for the plaintiffs and shall not be noticed of events in this case. Said attorney may apply to be readmitted as an attorney of record only after registering for admission to practice in this court and for the System. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (Copy mailed to non-registered attorney) (AOA)
October 30, 2012 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - The plaintiffs have until the close of business on November 14, 2012, to file evidence of service or show cause why this case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute the defendant. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (AOA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Manche et al v. Meis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin L. Manche
Represented By: Dirk V. Block
Represented By: Scott J. Mann
Represented By: Michael J. Wyatt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marla D. Manche
Represented By: Dirk V. Block
Represented By: Scott J. Mann
Represented By: Michael J. Wyatt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean M. Meis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]