United States of America v. $27,990.00 in United States Currency

Defendant: $27,990.00 in United States Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Case Number: 8:2012cv00220
Filed: June 27, 2012
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Referring Judge: F.A. Gossett
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 28:1345 Complaint for Forfeiture
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 10, 2012 18 Opinion or Order of the Court STRICKEN - MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding pending motions. Court finds defendants' products do not infringe the '288 patent directly, jointly, or indirectly. For this reason, the Court will grant defendants' motions for summary judgme nt as to non-infringement. Because the Court finds that defendants do not infringe the '288 patent, the Court does not consider defendants' other issues as delineated in their motions. A separate order will be entered in accordance with this memorandum opinion. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (JAB) Modified on 12/10/2012 to add "stricken" text pursuant to Order 19 . (JAB)
February 8, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: TRIAL PREPARATION (CIVIL JURY TRIAL). Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (JB)
June 4, 2013 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL - The parties' Stipulation for Dismissal with prejudice (Filing No. 44) is approved. This lawsuit is dismissed with prejudice. The Court will not assess costs or attorney's fees.Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (AOA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $27,990.00 in United States Currency
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $27,990.00 in United States Currency
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Nancy A. Svoboda
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]